Global Patent Index - EP 1258546 A2

EP 1258546 A2 2002-11-20 - Method for restarting a twisting device after a thread break

Title (en)

Method for restarting a twisting device after a thread break

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Wiederinbetriebsetzen einer Zwirneinrichtung nach einem Fadenbruch

Title (fr)

Procédé pour remiser en marche un dispositif de retordage après une cassure de fil

Publication

EP 1258546 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02005966 A

Priority

DE 10124270 A

Abstract (en)

Twisted thread is drawn back off the winding bobbin (S), until a thread section is reached in which the twist is intact. This section is fixed and parted, behind the fixing point with respect to the winding bobbin. The parting location assures sufficient thread length for mechanical- or hand knotting or splicing, to allow connection with the end from the twisting spindle. Twist spindle operation is resumed with a time delay in take-up, allowing for appropriate twist as the thread section between joining- and fixing points runs through. Preferred Features: A central controller (C) delays winding spool start up as the twist spindle runs up. The delay takes into consideration: spindle rotation speed, twist per meter and run-up time of the spindle.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zum Wiederinbetriebsetzen einer eine Zwirnspindel (A) und ein Aufwikkelaggregat (B) enthaltenden Zwirneinrichtung nach einem Fadenbruch wird der Zwirnfaden von der der Zwirnspindel nachgeschalteten Aufwickelspule abgezogen, den Zwirnfaden nach Erreichen eines Fadenstücks mit intakter Zwirndrehung in einem Fixierpunkt fixiert und, bezogen auf die Aufwickelspule, hinter diesem Fixierpunkt an einer solchen Stelle durchtrennt, daß genügend Fadenlänge vorhanden ist, um danach die hinter dem Fixierpunkt liegenden Einzelfäden mit den von der Zwirnspindel kommenden Spinnfadenenden mechanisch oder von Hand zu verknoten bzw. zu verspleißen, bevor man den Aufwickelprozeß derart zeitverzögert nach dem Wiederanlaufen der Zwirnspindel in Gang setzt, bis die für den Zwirn vorgegebene Zwirndrehung über die Verknotungs- bzw. Verspleißungsstelle bis zum Fixierpunkt durchgelaufen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 15/007; D01H 7/90; D02G 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/10 (2006.01); B65H 69/00 (2006.01); B65H 69/04 (2006.01); B65H 69/06 (2006.01); D01H 13/00 (2006.01); D01H 15/00 (2006.01); D01H 15/007 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 15/007 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258546 A2 20021120; EP 1258546 A3 20030507; CN 1386694 A 20021225; CZ 20021590 A3 20030115; DE 10124270 A1 20021205; JP 2002371440 A 20021226; US 2002170283 A1 20021121

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-11 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040619

2004-01-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI TR

2004-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI