Global Patent Index - EP 1258547 A1

EP 1258547 A1 2002-11-20 - Air-jet textured yarn and method of its manufacture

Title (en)

Air-jet textured yarn and method of its manufacture

Title (de)

Lufttexturierter Faden sowie Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung

Title (fr)

Fils texturés par jet d'air et méthode de fabrication

Publication

EP 1258547 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02010944 A

Priority

DE 10124162 A

Abstract (en)

Individual filaments or fibers (17a, 17b) in the air textured raw thread (19) show a mean fineness of less than about 1.2 dtex without finishing. An Independent claim is also included for the corresponding method of manufacturing air textured threads as described, especially for sewing.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Faden, insbesondere Nähfaden, aus wenigstens einem Rohgarn, das durch Lufttexturierung aus zumindest einem aus Einzelfilamenten oder Einzelfasern bestehenden Vorgarn hergestellt ist, wobei in dem lufttexturierten Rohgarn ohne Ausrüstung die Einzelfilamente oder Einzelfasern eine durchschnittliche Feinheit von weniger als etwa 1,2 dtex aufweisen. Die Erfindung betrifft außerdem ein Verfahren zur Herstellung lufttexturierter Fäden.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02G 1/16; D02G 3/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02G 1/16 (2006.01); D02G 3/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02G 3/46 (2013.01); D02G 1/165 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258547 A1 20021120; CZ 20021648 A3 20030115; DE 10124162 A1 20021121; HU 0201672 A2 20060728; HU 0201672 D0 20020729; PL 353900 A1 20021118

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040525

2004-02-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040114

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-08-06 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030520

- Countries: LT

2003-08-06 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030520

- Countries: MK

2003-08-06 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030520

- Countries: RO

2003-08-06 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030520

- Countries: SI

2003-07-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030520

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI