Global Patent Index - EP 1258548 A1

EP 1258548 A1 2002-11-20 - Air-jet textured yarn and method of its manufacture

Title (en)

Air-jet textured yarn and method of its manufacture

Title (de)

Lufttexturierter Faden sowie Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung

Title (fr)

Fils texturés par jet d'air et méthode de fabrication

Publication

EP 1258548 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02010945 A

Priority

DE 10124161 A

Abstract (en)

In the unfinished air-textured thread, individual filaments or fibers (17a, 17b) have a mean fineness less than about 3.0 dtex. The thread (19) produced, has no intrinsic twist. An Independent claim is also included for the corresponding method of air-textured thread manufacture.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Faden, insbesondere Nähfaden, aus wenigstens einem Rohgarn, das durch Lufttexturierung aus zumindest einem aus Einzelfilamenten oder Einzelfasern bestehenden Vorgarn hergestellt ist, wobei in dem lufttexturierten Rohgarn ohne Ausrüstung die Einzelfilamente oder Einzelfasern eine durchschnittliche Feinheit von weniger als etwa 1,2 dtex aufweisen. Die Erfindung betrifft außerdem ein Verfahren zur Herstellung lufttexturierter Fäden.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02G 1/16; D02G 3/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02G 1/16 (2006.01); D02G 3/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02G 3/46 (2013.01); D02G 1/165 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258548 A1 20021120; CZ 20021649 A3 20030115; DE 10124161 A1 20021121; HU 0201674 A2 20051028; HU 0201674 D0 20020729; PL 353899 A1 20021118

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040525

2004-02-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040114

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-08-06 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030520

- Countries: LT

2003-08-06 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030520

- Countries: MK

2003-08-06 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030520

- Countries: RO

2003-08-06 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030520

- Countries: SI

2003-07-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030520

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI