Global Patent Index - EP 1258549 A2

EP 1258549 A2 2002-11-20 - Use of an air jet textured yarn

Title (en)

Use of an air jet textured yarn

Title (de)

Verwendung eines lufttexturierten Fadens

Title (fr)

Utilisation d'un fil texturé par jet d'air

Publication

EP 1258549 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02010625 A

Priority

DE 10124165 A

Abstract (en)

The thread used (19) is manufactured by air texturing without finishing, from a preliminary thread (11) comprising individual filaments or fibers (17a, 17b). Fineness is less than 1.2 dtex. The thread is used for sewing where fibers of nominal tag size exceeding 100, or a fineness of less than about 300 dtex are required. Preferred features: Microfilaments or microfibers included in the thread, are up to 1.2 dtex and are especially less than about 1.0 dtex.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft die Verwendung eines Fadens, der aus wenigstens einem Rohgarn (19) besteht, das durch Lufttexturierung aus zumindest einem aus Einzelfilamenten oder Einzelfasern (17a,17b) bestehenden Vorgarn hergestellt ist und in dem ohne Ausrüstung die Einzelfilamente oder Einzelfasern eine durchschnittliche Feinheit von weniger als etwa 1,2 dtex aufweisen, als Nähfaden in wenigstens einem Einsatzgebiet für Fäden mit einer Etikett-Nummer von mehr als etwa No 100 oder einer Feinheit von weniger als etwa 300 dtex. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02G 3/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02G 3/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02G 3/46 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258549 A2 20021120; EP 1258549 A3 20031203; CZ 20021647 A3 20030115; DE 10124165 A1 20021121; HU 0201675 A2 20060728; HU 0201675 D0 20020729; PL 353898 A1 20021118

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040602

2004-08-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-08-25 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20040108

- Countries: LT

2004-08-25 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20040108

- Countries: MK

2004-08-25 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20040108

- Countries: RO

2004-08-25 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20040108

- Countries: SI

2004-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040322

2004-03-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040108

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-12-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI