Global Patent Index - EP 1258550 A2

EP 1258550 A2 2002-11-20 - Weft insertion control apparatus in jet loom

Title (en)

Weft insertion control apparatus in jet loom

Title (de)

Schussfadeneintragskontrollvorrichtung in eine Düsenwebmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de contrôle de l'insertion de trame dans un métier à jet

Publication

EP 1258550 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02009374 A

Priority

  • JP 2001141576 A
  • JP 2002015613 A

Abstract (en)

A distance L1 between a rotation axis 222 of a stepping motor 22 and a first guide ring 24 is made shorter than a distance L2 between the rotation axis 222 and a second guide ring 25. When weft Y1 is on a second yarn route, that is, when a yarn route changing body 23 is in a weft braking position, a yarn bending angle alpha becomes larger than a yarn bending angle beta . <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/34; B65H 59/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 59/26 (2006.01); D03D 47/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/34 (2013.01); B65H 59/26 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258550 A2 20021120; EP 1258550 A3 20030205; EP 1258550 B1 20060712; CN 1225577 C 20051102; CN 1385568 A 20021218; KR 100482533 B1 20050414; KR 20020086288 A 20021118; TW 565637 B 20031211

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100506

2011-03-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-12-08 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101201

2010-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: K.K. *TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI

- Effective date: 20100531

2009-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090428

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090516

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090517

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-06-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070413

2006-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE IT NL

2006-07-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060712

2003-11-27 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-10-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE IT NL

2003-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-02-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020506

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI