Global Patent Index - EP 1258551 A1

EP 1258551 A1 2002-11-20 - Method for operating a loom

Title (en)

Method for operating a loom

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Webmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé d'utilisation d'un métier à tisser

Publication

EP 1258551 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01111305 A

Priority

EP 01111305 A

Abstract (en)

The neuro-fuzzy control system (9) (NFS) provided, comprises a neural network (14) and fuzzy logic unit (15). This NFS is fed with the same operational signals as the warp release adjustment- and product withdrawal algorithms (7, 8) appropriate to the machine type. Parameters (2) characterizing the material to be worked are also entered. Computed results from the NFS and controller settings (10, 12) flow into the algorithms (7, 8).

Abstract (de)

Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Webmaschine bei dem der Kettablass-Einstellalgorithmus und die Kettablaßeinstellparameter sowie der Warenabzugeinstellalgorithmus und die Warenabzugeinstellparameter für den Maschinentyp über von Sensoren erfassbare Signale und/oder von einer Bedienungsperson eingegebenen Signalen eingestellt werden und über Reglerstellgrößen die Steuerung der Webmaschine bewirkt wird, wobei ein Neuro-Fuzzy-Steuerungssystem (9) vorgesehen ist, das ein neuronales Netz (14) und eine Fuzzy-Logik (15) enthält, und das mit denselben Signalen (5) versehen wird wie obige Algorithmen (7, 8) und in welche die das zu verarbeitende Material charakterisierenden Parameter (2) eingegeben werden und dass die Rechenergebnisse des Neuro-Fuzzy-Steuerungssystems (9) in die Algorithmen (7, 8) und Reglerstellgrößen (10, 12) einfließen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 51/02; D03D 49/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 49/04 (2006.01); D03D 51/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 49/04 (2013.01); D03D 51/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258551 A1 20021120; EP 1258551 B1 20030115; DE 50100087 D1 20030220

INPADOC legal status


2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110509

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110131

2010-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BERGER LAHR G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100524

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090525

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090526

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090526

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090519

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-03-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2008-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC MOTION DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO.

- Free text: BERGER LAHR GMBH & CO. KG#BRESLAUER STRASSE 7#77933 LAHR (DE) -TRANSFER TO- SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC MOTION DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG#BRESLAUER STRASSE 7#77933 LAHR (DE)

2004-01-23 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2004-01-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031016

2003-08-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1258551E

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR IT LI

2003-08-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030115

2003-03-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BERGER LAHR GMBH & CO. KG

2003-03-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HEPP, WENGER & RYFFEL AG

2003-02-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50100087 P 20030220

2003-02-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR IT LI

2003-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BERGER LAHR POSITEC GMBH & CO. KG

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011213

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI