Global Patent Index - EP 1258558 A1

EP 1258558 A1 2002-11-20 - Dynamic cable, and method and apparatus for producing such a cable

Title (en)

Dynamic cable, and method and apparatus for producing such a cable

Title (de)

Dynamisches Seil sowie Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung eines solchen Seiles

Title (fr)

Câble dynamique, et procédé et installation de fabrication d'un tel câble

Publication

EP 1258558 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02010033 A

Priority

FR 0106491 A

Abstract (en)

The cable (9) is made from a number of strands (2) wound round a core (1), with the spaces between the strands and core filled with a polymer material. The polymer is applied in the form of a polymerizable compound by an injection head (15) situated upstream of the cabling point (13). The cable (9) is made from a number of strands (2) wound round a core (1), with the spaces between the strands and core filled with a polymer material. The polymer is applied in the form of a polymerizable compound by an injection head (15) situated upstream of the cabling point (13). The position of the head being determined so that the strands are wound round the core when the polymerisation is at a sufficiently viscoplastic state to ensure a continuous coating while being fluid enough to fill the spaces between the core and strands, and between the strands. The compound can be applied to the core alone or to the core and strands, and is made up just before application by mixing predetermined proportions of a pre polymer containing isocyanates and a polymerisation accelerator. The cable is made from core strands (5) from reels (11) and outer winding strands (2) from reels (14) passing through a cabling head (13) after the polymer injection head (15) with a mixing chamber connected to tanks containing the pre-polymer and polymerisation accelerator.

Abstract (fr)

Le câble (9) comporte une pluralité de torons (2) toronnés autour d'une âme (1), les espaces entre torons et/ou entre âme et torons étant comblés par un matériau polymère à base de polyuréthane (3). On réalise le câble en déposant sur l'âme et/ou les torons par des moyens d'enduction (15) éloigné en amont du point de câblage (13), le dit polymère, dont la composition et le lieu d'enduction sont déterminés de manière que les torons soient placés autour de l'âme lorsque la polymérisation du composé est suffisamment avancée pour que le polymère formé soit dans un état viscoplastique propre à former une couche d'enrobage sensiblement continue adhérente mais encore suffisamment fluide pour s'infiltrer dans les interstices entre âme et torons, et entre torons. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D07B 7/14; D07B 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D07B 1/16 (2006.01); D07B 7/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D07B 7/145 (2013.01); D07B 1/165 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258558 A1 20021120; EP 1258558 B1 20070725; AT 368146 T 20070815; CA 2383309 A1 20021117; CA 2383309 C 20071002; DE 60221320 D1 20070906; DE 60221320 T2 20080417; ES 2290212 T3 20080216; FR 2824849 A1 20021122; FR 2824849 B1 20050610; PT 1258558 E 20071003; US 2002189227 A1 20021219

INPADOC legal status


2018-06-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20180424

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170421

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170421

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170607

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20170502

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20170425

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170421

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170426

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170420

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170426

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-07-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NOVAGRAAF SWITZERLAND SA;CHEMIN DE L'ECHO 3;1213 ONEX (CH)

2010-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070725

2010-07-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ARCELORMITTAL WIRE FRANCE

- Free text: ARCELORMITTAL WIRE FRANCE#25, AVENUE DE LYON#01000 BOURG EN BRESSE (FR) -TRANSFER TO- ARCELORMITTAL WIRE FRANCE#25, AVENUE DE LYON#01000 BOURG EN BRESSE (FR)

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070725

2009-03-01 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2008-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-10-03 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2008-08-08 [REG PT PD4A] CHANGE OF PROPRIETORSHIP

- Owner name: ARCELORMITTAL WIRE FRANCE, FR

- Effective date: 20080728

2008-07-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080428

2008-06-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071025

2008-05-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070725

2008-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: WILLIAM BLANC & CIE CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INDUSTRI

2008-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070725

2008-03-14 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ARCELORMITTAL WIRE FRANCE

- Free text: TREFILEUROPE#25, AVENUE DE LYON#01000 BOURG EN BRESSE (FR) -TRANSFER TO- ARCELORMITTAL WIRE FRANCE#25, AVENUE DE LYON#01000 BOURG EN BRESSE (FR)

2008-03-05 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2008-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2290212 T3

2008-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2008-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070725

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070725

2007-11-15 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20070403039

2007-10-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20071004

2007-10-03 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20070921

2007-09-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60221320 P 20070906

2007-09-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2007-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-07-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2007-07-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030310

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI