Global Patent Index - EP 1258559 A1

EP 1258559 A1 2002-11-20 - Method for brightening mechanical pulps

Title (en)

Method for brightening mechanical pulps

Title (de)

Verfahren zum bleichen von mechanischen Pulpe

Title (fr)

Procede de blanchiment des pates mecaniques

Publication

EP 1258559 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02253048 A

Priority

US 28993701 P

Abstract (en)

The present invention is directed to an improved method for brightening mechanical pulp under neutral or alkaline papermaking conditions. The improvement comprises the steps of: (a) separating neutral or alkaline pulp dilution water into a high-solids stream and a neutral or alkaline low-solids stream; and (b) reusing the neutral or alkaline low-solids stream for pulp dilution purposes prior to a bleaching process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21C 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21C 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21C 9/1026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258559 A1 20021120; EP 1258559 B1 20040623; CA 2384399 A1 20021109; DE 60200662 D1 20040729; DE 60200662 T2 20050707; JP 2002339282 A 20021127; NO 20022118 A 20021111; NO 20022118 D0 20020503; US 2003062138 A1 20030403

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-01-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-06-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050324

2005-05-01 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050501

2005-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2004-09-14 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-07-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60200662 P 20040729

2004-07-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI GB SE

2004-06-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FI GB SE

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030210

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020510

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI