Global Patent Index - EP 1258561 A2

EP 1258561 A2 2002-11-20 - Wet-strong tissue paper

Title (en)

Wet-strong tissue paper

Title (de)

Nassfestes Tissuepapier

Title (fr)

Papier tissu résistant à l'humidité

Publication

EP 1258561 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02445060 A

Priority

SE 0101810 A

Abstract (en)

A strong and soft tissue paper having a bulk between 2 and 8 cm<3>/g, containing a wet strength agent in the form of a nitrogen-containing polymer having hydrophobic side-chain substituents. The tissue paper before converting has a relative wet strength value (RWS) of at least 45%.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 21/20; C08G 69/48; C08G 73/02; D21H 17/55; D21H 17/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21H 21/20 (2006.01); D21H 17/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 21/20 (2013.01); D21H 17/54 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258561 A2 20021120; EP 1258561 A3 20040908; SE 0101810 D0 20010518; SE 0101810 L 20021119; SE 522783 C2 20040309

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061201

2005-05-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-04-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050214

2004-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-09-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-09-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 21H 21/20 A

2004-09-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 21H 17/55 B

2004-09-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 21H 17/56 B

2004-09-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 08G 69/48 B

2004-09-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 08G 73/02 B

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI