Global Patent Index - EP 1258565 A1

EP 1258565 A1 2002-11-20 - Prefabricated bridge bearing

Title (en)

Prefabricated bridge bearing

Title (de)

Vorgefertigtes Brückenlager

Title (fr)

Appui de pont préfabriqué

Publication

EP 1258565 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02291237 A

Priority

FR 0106616 A

Abstract (en)

The support for a bridge deck (B) consists of one or more metal piles (1, 1') driven into the ground by impact or vibration and left with projecting upper ends (11) that are fitted with hollow prefabricated caisson members (2) that extend horizontally and across the lengthwise axis of the deck. Each caisson has side walls delimiting a central cavity that receives the upper end of a pile with projecting fastening elements (12) before it is filled with concrete (D). Before the concrete has set a distribution panel (5) with fastenings (52) on the underside is laid on top of it, and the panel receives the bridge deck once the concrete has hardened.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention a pour objet la réalisation d'un organe d'appui pour un ouvrage de franchissement, notamment une culée (A). Conformément à l'invention, pour réaliser chaque organe d'appui (A), on enfonce tout d'abord dans le sol, au moins un pieu (1) ayant une partie supérieure (11) qui est coiffée par une pièce préfabriquée (2) en forme de caisson creux limitant un évidement central (20) qui est enfilé sur la partie supérieure (11) du pieu (1) puis rempli de béton (D) et, avant la prise du béton, on pose sur celui-ci au moins une plaque de répartition (5) ayant une face inférieure (51) d'application sur le béton (D) et une face supérieure (53) constituant, après la prise du béton, un appui pour la partie correspondante du tablier (B). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01D 19/02; E02D 27/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01D 19/02 (2006.01); E02D 27/32 (2006.01); E02D 27/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01D 19/02 (2013.01); E02D 27/32 (2013.01); E02D 27/14 (2013.01); E02D 2250/0023 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258565 A1 20021120; FR 2824851 A1 20021122; FR 2824851 B1 20031212; JP 2003003420 A 20030108

INPADOC legal status


2007-03-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060902

2003-11-05 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20030520

- Countries: AL

2003-11-05 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20030520

- Countries: LT

2003-11-05 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20030520

- Countries: LV

2003-11-05 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20030520

- Countries: MK

2003-11-05 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20030520

- Countries: RO

2003-11-05 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20030520

- Countries: SI

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030520

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI