Global Patent Index - EP 1258569 A2

EP 1258569 A2 2002-11-20 - Modular system for forming lavatory flush tanks with different operating modes, and lavatory flush tank forming part of such a modular system

Title (en)

Modular system for forming lavatory flush tanks with different operating modes, and lavatory flush tank forming part of such a modular system

Title (de)

Modulsystem zum Ausrüsten von Spülkästen mit verschiedenen Spülmöglichkeiten und Spülkasten eines solchen Systems

Title (fr)

Système modulaire pour créer des réservoirs de chasse d'eau avec différents modes d'opération et réservoirs de chasse faisant partie d'un tel système

Publication

EP 1258569 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02010840 A

Priority

IT MI20010276 U

Abstract (en)

A modular system (1) for forming lavatory flush tanks (2) with different operating modes, and including at least one water tank (3) having an opening (13) formed through one wall (4); at least one flush device (14) housable inside the water tank; and a number of control assemblies (15) of different interchangeable types, each of the control assemblies (15) being partly insertable through the opening (13), and having releasable fastening means (21) for connection to the wall (4). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03D 1/01; E03D 1/012; E03D 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 1/01 (2006.01); E03D 1/012 (2006.01); E03D 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03D 1/012 (2013.01); E03D 1/01 (2013.01); E03D 5/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258569 A2 20021120; EP 1258569 A3 20030326; EP 1258569 A8 20030409; IT MI20010276 U1 20021118; IT MI20010276 V0 20010516

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060314

2003-12-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030926

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-03-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 03D 1/01 A

2003-03-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 03D 1/012 B

2003-03-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 03D 5/02 B

2003-03-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 03D 1/00 B

2003-03-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 03D 1/14 B

2003-03-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 03D 5/10 B

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI