Global Patent Index - EP 1258591 A1

EP 1258591 A1 2002-11-20 - Electric door operator

Title (en)

Electric door operator

Title (de)

Elektrischer Türantrieb

Title (fr)

Dispositif électrique de commande de porte

Publication

EP 1258591 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02291153 A

Priority

US 28921901 P

Abstract (en)

An electric door operator is provided for controlling the opening and closing of a door pivotally mounted to a door frame of a multi-passenger mass transit vehicle. The electric door operator comprises a pinion and an energy source for rotating or driving this pinion in opposite directions through opening and closing cycles of the door. A gear sector is also provided which is mounted for rotation in an opposite direction from the pinion. The gear sector is engageable with the pinion and capable of being driven by the pinion such that it rotates in one of an opening and closing direction upon rotation of the pinion. A shaft member having a first and second end is provided. The first end of the shaft member is secured to the gear sector and the second end of the shaft member is engageable with one of a base plate and a wall portion of the vehicle. A push bar is suspended from the gear sector for one of opening and closing the door upon rotation of the gear sector in one of the opening and closing directions. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 15/12; E05F 15/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/10 (2006.01); E05F 15/12 (2006.01); E05F 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/63 (2013.01); E05F 15/603 (2013.01); E05F 17/004 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/214 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/244 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/25 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/51 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258591 A1 20021120; EP 1258591 B1 20040728; BR 0202411 A 20050222; DE 60200806 D1 20040902; DE 60200806 T2 20050908; DE 60200806 T8 20051222

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120507

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-03-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60200806

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-03-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120507

2013-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120507

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110505

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110517

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110504

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110523

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-07-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-06-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60200806 P 20040902

2004-08-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-07-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030416

2003-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030304

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI