Global Patent Index - EP 1258592 A1

EP 1258592 A1 2002-11-20 - Inlaid store front with fire resistant sheets of glass

Title (en)

Inlaid store front with fire resistant sheets of glass

Title (de)

Zurückgesetzter Ladeneingang mit Brandschutzverglasung

Title (fr)

Entrée reculée d'une magasin avec vitrage anti-feu

Publication

EP 1258592 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01111740 A

Priority

EP 01111740 A

Abstract (en)

Fire protection glazing comprises several fixed fire protection panes (1) arranged in a common plane, an opening closed by at least one moving door leaf (5), and a support construction consisting of supports (7) arranged a distance away from the fire protection panes and fixed with their ends to room-defining surfaces (4). The supports are connected to the fire protection panes via support brackets (8). The door leaf is arranged so that it is set back relative to the plane of the fixed fire protection panes in the plane of the supports. The hinge of the door leaf is fixed on the support adjacent to the door leaf. Preferred Features: A flat element (11) made of fire-resistant material extends from a traverse horizontally toward the plane of the fixed fire protection panes. The flat element is supported with its two short edges against a support bracket.

Abstract (de)

Vorgeschlagen wird eine Brandschutzverglasung mit mehreren in einer gemeinsamen Ebene feststehend angeordneten Brandschutzscheiben (1) sowie einer durch mindestens einen beweglichen Türflügel verschließbaren Durchtrittsöffnung in der Brandschutzverglasung. Seitlich wird die Brandschutzverglasung durch eine Stützkonstruktion aus mit seitlichem Abstand zu den Brandschutzscheiben (1) angeordneten Stützen (7) gehalten. Die Stützen (7) sind mit ihren Enden an raumbegrenzenden Flächen befestigt, wobei sie über daran befestigte, horizontale Tragkonsolen (8) mit den Brandschutzscheiben (1) verbunden sind. Um eine einfach aufgebaute und sich im Brandfall nicht oder nur wenig wölbende Brandschutzverglasung zu schaffen, die sich durch ein verbessertes Brandschutzverhalten im Bereich der integrierten Türöffnung auszeichnet, ist der Türflügel (5) gegenüber der Ebene der Brandschutzscheiben (1) zurückspringend in der Ebene der Stützen (7) angeordnet. Das Scharnier (22) des Türflügels ist an der an den Türflügel angrenzenden Stütze (7) befestigt. Vorzugsweise werden die Türlaibungen rund um die Türöffnung ebenfalls durch Brandschutzscheiben (10 bzw. 11) gebildet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 1/38; E06B 5/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/38 (2006.01); E06B 5/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/38 (2013.01); E06B 5/162 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258592 A1 20021120; EP 1258592 B1 20041103; AT 281583 T 20041115; CZ 20012659 A3 20030115; CZ 298545 B6 20071031; DE 50104389 D1 20041209; PL 196326 B1 20071231; PL 348948 A1 20021118

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180523

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180522

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-07-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20180628 AND 20180706

2018-07-04 [REG NL HC] CHANGE OF NAME(S) OF PROPRIETOR(S)

- Owner name: HOLZBAU SCHMID GMBH & CO. KG; DE

- Free text: DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: CHANGE OF OWNER(S), CHANGE OF OWNER(S) NAME; FORMER OWNER NAME: PROMAT GMBH

- Effective date: 20180518

2018-06-15 [REG CH PFUS] MERGER

- Owner name: HOLZBAU SCHMID GMBH AND CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HOLZBAU SCHMID GMBH AND CO. KG, DE

2018-05-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-17 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HOLZBAU SCHMID GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: PROMAT GMBH, 40878 RATINGEN, DE; HOLZBAU SCHMID GMBH & CO. KG, 73099 ADELBERG, DE

- Document: DE 50104389

2018-05-17 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ETEX BUILDING PERFORMANCE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: PROMAT GMBH, 40878 RATINGEN, DE; HOLZBAU SCHMID GMBH & CO. KG, 73099 ADELBERG, DE

- Document: DE 50104389

2018-05-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50104389

- Representative's name: RING & WEISBRODT PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, DE

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050403

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: HOLZBAU SCHMID GMBH & CO. KG

- Free text: HOLZBAU SCHMID GMBH & CO. KG#ZIEGELHAU 1-4#73099 ADELBERG (DE) $ PROMAT GMBH#SCHEIFENKAMP 16#40878 RATINGEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- HOLZBAU SCHMID GMBH & CO. KG#ZIEGELHAU 1-4#73099 ADELBERG (DE) $ PROMAT GMBH#SCHEIFENKAMP 16#40878 RATINGEN (DE)

2005-10-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050804

2005-07-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-15 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050515

2005-05-15 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050515

2005-02-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050120

2005-02-03 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050203

2005-02-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050203

2005-02-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050203

2004-12-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50104389 P 20041209

2004-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-11-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-11-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-11-03 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-11-03 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-11-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-11-03 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041103

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030405

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI