Global Patent Index - EP 1258596 A1

EP 1258596 A1 2002-11-20 - Method for refurbishing a tunnel drainage system

Title (en)

Method for refurbishing a tunnel drainage system

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Sanierung von Tunnelentwässerungen

Title (fr)

Procedé pour assainir un système de drainage de tunnels

Publication

EP 1258596 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02100459 A

Priority

AT 4032001 U

Abstract (en)

Process for renovating tunnel drainage comprises drilling a bore (9) at an angle downward toward a drainage pipe (5) so that the bore opens into the drainage pipe in the region of a rinsing recess (8). A cable is run through the drainage pipe from this rinsing recess to another rinsing recess. A drill rod is inserted in the drainage pipe via the bore and the drainage pipe is rebored. The drill head is pulled by the cable so that it remains in the drainage pipe. The drill head is then exchanged for a rock scraper and the cross-section is widened in the opposite direction. A new drainage pipe is inserted in the widened cross-section. Preferred Features: The cross-section is widened twice to destroy the residue of the existing drainage pipe.

Abstract (de)

In Tunnels ist zur Entwässerung der Tunnelrückwand üblicherweise eine Drainageleitung (5) unterhalb des Fahrbahnniveaus vorgesehen, und in der Tunnelwand sind in regelmäßigen Abständen Spülnischen (8) vorgesehen, die bis zu den Drainageleitungen (5) reichen. Um die Drainageleitung (5) zu erneuern, bohrt man eine Kernbohrung (9) schräg nach unten zur Drainageleitung (5), so dass die Kernbohrung (9) im Bereich einer Spülnische (8) in die Drainageleitung (5) mündet. Dann zieht man von dieser Spülnische (8) bis zu einer anderen Spülnische ein Seil in die Drainageleitung ein. Danach führt man über die Kernbohrung ein Bohrgestänge eines Bohrgerätes (11) in die Drainageleitung ein und bohrt die Drainageleitung (5) mit dem Bohrgerät (11) auf, wobei der Bohrkopf mittels des Seils gezogen wird, so dass er in der Drainageleitung (5) bleiben muss. Am Ziel angekommen, tauscht man den Bohrkopf gegen einen Felsräumer aus, erweitert nun in der Gegenrichtung den Querschnitt und saugt den Abraum ab. Nun kann man eine neue Drainageleitung in den erweiterten Querschnitt einziehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21F 16/02; E21B 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 7/04 (2006.01); E21B 7/28 (2006.01); E21F 16/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 7/04 (2013.01); E21B 7/28 (2013.01); E21F 16/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258596 A1 20021120; EP 1258596 B1 20080326; AT 390541 T 20080415; AT 4562 U2 20010827; AT 4562 U3 20020425

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150508

2016-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150531

2016-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150531

2016-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 390541 T

- Effective date: 20150508

2015-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140825

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140602

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-12-31 [REG CH AECN] CONTINUATION OF PROCEEDINGS AGREED

- Free text: DAS PATENT IST AUFGRUND DES WEITERBEHANDLUNGSANTRAGS VOM 02.12.2013 REAKTIVIERT WORDEN.

2013-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080326

2009-03-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081230

2008-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHNEIDER FELDMANN AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE

2008-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH IT LI

2003-09-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH IT LI

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030414

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI