Global Patent Index - EP 1258603 A1

EP 1258603 A1 2002-11-20 - Vehicle engine with engine braking device and exhaust gases recirculation

Title (en)

Vehicle engine with engine braking device and exhaust gases recirculation

Title (de)

Brennkraftmaschine in einem Fahrzeug mit einer Motorbremsvorrichtung und einer Abgasrückführeinrichtung

Title (fr)

Moteur pour véhicule comprenant un dispositif de frein moteur et un système de recirculation des gaz d'échappement

Publication

EP 1258603 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02009824 A

Priority

AT 7602001 A

Abstract (en)

An EGR (Exhaust Gas Recirculation) control device (15) adjusts via an adjusting motor (17) to an EGR shut-off or open position for adjusting part of the exhaust gas from an internal combustion engine cylinders (C1-C6) for its return via an EGR pipe (12). Power for the adjusting motor and for a second adjusting motor allocated to an exhaust brake flap (19) comes from a source (25) of power via a feed pipe (26,32,34) with an in-built flow control (27) taking its switching commands from a common electronic control unit (37).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Brennkraftmaschine der Reihen oder V-Bauart in einem Fahrzeug mit einer Motorstaubremseinrichtung, bestehend aus einer motorinternen Bremseinrichtung und einer Motorbremsklappe in einer Abgasleitung, die mittels eines Stellmotors ein- bzw verstellbar ist, und mit einer Abgasrückführeinrichtung mit wenigstens einem AGR-Steuerorgan und einer AGR-Leitung, über die Abgas von der Auslass- zur Einlassstelle der Brennkraftmaschine rückführbar ist. Die Erfindung besteht darin, wenigstens ein AGR-Steuerorgan (15) vorzusehen, das mittels eines Stellmotors (17) in eine AGR-Absperrposition und wenigstens eine AGR-Durchlassposition, in der es einen Teil des aus den Zylindern der Brennkraftmaschine ausgestoßenen Abgases für dessen Rückführung über die AGR-Leitung (12, 12/1, 12/2) durchlässt, einstellbar ist, dass ferner die Energieversorgung des dem AGR-Steuerorgan (15) zugeordneten Stellmotors (17) ebenso wie jene des der Motorbremsklappe (19) zugeordneten Stellmotors (18) von einer Energiequelle (25) her über eine Zuleitung (26, 32, 34) mit eingebauter Durchlasssteuereinrichtung (27) erfolgt, die ihre Schaltbefehle für eine Stellmotor-Betätigung von einer gemeinsamen elektronischen Regel- und Steuereinheit (37) in dem Sinne erhält, dass während des Motorbremsbetriebes eine Abgasrückführung durch das AGR-Steuerorgan (15) unterbindbar und die Motorbremsklappe (19) in der Abgasleitung (6, 6/1, 6/2, 7, 7/1, 7/2, 20) in eine Drosselposition einstellbar ist, dagegen während AGR-Betriebsphasen sowohl das AGR-Steuerorgan (15) als auch die Motorbremsklappe (19) auf Durchlass geschaltet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 13/06; F02D 9/06; F02M 25/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 13/06 (2006.01); F02D 9/06 (2006.01); F02M 26/42 (2016.01); F02M 26/54 (2016.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 9/06 (2013.01); F01L 13/06 (2013.01); F02M 26/42 (2016.02); F02M 26/54 (2016.02); F02B 29/0412 (2013.01); F02M 26/05 (2016.02); F02M 26/08 (2016.02); F02M 26/23 (2016.02)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0736672 A2 19961009 - STEYR NUTZFAHRZEUGE [AT]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258603 A1 20021120; EP 1258603 B1 20060301; AT 411545 B 20040225; AT A7602001 A 20030715; DE 50205900 D1 20060427

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20180529

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180529

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180524

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180525

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170731

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170524

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-05-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-05-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-07-15 [REG AT HC] CHANGE OF THE FIRM NAME OR FIRM ADDRESS

- Owner name: MAN TRUCK & BUS OESTERREICH AG, AT

- Document: AT 318997 T

- Effective date: 20120530

2012-04-13 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: MAN TRUCK & BUS OSTERREICH AG

- Effective date: 20120314

2012-03-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MAN TRUCK & BUS OESTERREICH AG, AT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE OESTERREICH AG, STEYR, AT

- Document: DE 50205900

- Effective date: 20120125

2012-02-29 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20120223

2007-02-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061204

2006-10-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-05-30 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50205900 P 20060427

2006-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT NL SE

2005-08-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE OESTERREICH AG

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT NL SE

2002-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021008

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI