Global Patent Index - EP 1258607 A2

EP 1258607 A2 2002-11-20 - Mountable exit pipe for a tail pipe silencer as well as a tail pipe silencer for a vehicle

Title (en)

Mountable exit pipe for a tail pipe silencer as well as a tail pipe silencer for a vehicle

Title (de)

Montierbares Auslassrohr für einen Endschalldämpfer sowie Endschalldämpfer für ein Kraftfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Tube de sortie montable pour un silencieux terminal et aussi un silencieux terminal pour un véhicule

Publication

EP 1258607 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02010399 A

Priority

DE 10123567 A

Abstract (en)

A hook (22) on the exhaust pipe (18) hangs onto the housing (2) and a holding strap with opening for a nut of a screwdown fixing is welded or soldered to the strap. Hook (22) and strap are made from a single strip as fixed between manifold pipes. The housing is in two parts (2A,2B) joined by beaded edges (4). The strap (16) is on the housing side facing the pipe (18). The housing parts have collared (10) outlets (12), each to take an outlet pipe (14).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung geht aus von einem montierbaren Auslassrohr (18) für einen Endschalldämpfer sowie einem Endschalldämpfer für ein Kraftfahrzeug mit Mitteln zum Befestigen des Auslassrohres (18) am Endschalldämpfergehäuse (2). Es wird vorgeschlagen, dass am Auslassrohr (18) ein Haken (22) vorgesehen ist, der am Endschalldämpfergehäuse (2) einhängbar ist und dass am Auslassrohr (18) eine mit einer Öffnung (24) versehene Haltelasche (26) angeordnet ist, die am Endschalldämpfergehäuse (2) über eine Mutter-Schraubenverbindung (28, 30) befestigbar ist. Damit wird auf einfache Art und Weise eine leicht montierbare Befestigung eines Auslassrohres an einem Endschalldämpfergehäuse erreicht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 7/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 13/08 (2010.01); F01N 13/18 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 13/1855 (2013.01); F01N 13/082 (2013.01); F01N 13/1805 (2013.01); F01N 2470/18 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19914426 A1 20001012 - DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258607 A2 20021120; EP 1258607 A3 20041117; EP 1258607 B1 20070328; DE 10123567 A1 20021128; DE 50209813 D1 20070510; JP 2003003839 A 20030108; US 2002185332 A1 20021212; US 6913111 B2 20050705

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120508

2013-03-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120508

2013-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120508

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110524

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110520

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110607

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-06-17 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2011-04-27 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110331 AND 20110406

2011-04-06 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110310 AND 20110316

2009-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2009-10-09 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-03-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080102

2007-07-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070614

2007-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50209813 P 20070510

2007-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-03-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-08-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-07-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050517

2004-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-11-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI