Global Patent Index - EP 1258608 A3

EP 1258608 A3 2004-12-01 - Engine having a cooling water port cover

Title (en)

Engine having a cooling water port cover

Title (de)

Brennkraftmaschine mit einem Kühlwasserkanaldeckel

Title (fr)

Moteur à combustion interne avec un couvercle pour les conduits de refroidissement par eau

Publication

EP 1258608 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 02009169 A

Priority

JP 2001145069 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1258608A2] A cooling water inlet/outlet cover affixed to a side surface of a cylinder head 2 of an engine E includes a first cover portion C1 and a second cover portion C2. The first cover portion C1 defines an inflow path 20 for introducing cooling water from a radiator 25 to an inlet 42 communicating with a thermostat-type path opening/closing mechanism 15. The second cover portion C2 defines an outflow path 21 for guiding cooling water from the outlet 49 to a radiator 25 and an outflow path 22 partitioned from the outflow path 21 by the partition wall 68 to guide cooling water from the outlet 52 to a heater core 29 and a throttle body 7. The cooling water inlet/outlet cover C further includes a reservoir portion 71 for holding an extruded part of a liquid packing 54 to be coated around the outlets 49, 52 to prevent the extruded part of the liquid packing 54 from spoiling an elastic material packing 46. This configuration contributes to facilitating connection of hoses to the cooling water inlet and outlets formed in the engine body, thereby facilitating assembly of the engine, and further reducing the number of parts. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01P 7/16; F01P 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02F 1/36 (2006.01); F01P 3/02 (2006.01); F01P 7/16 (2006.01); F01P 11/00 (2006.01); F02F 7/00 (2006.01); F02F 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01P 11/00 (2013.01); F01P 7/16 (2013.01); F01P 2060/00 (2013.01); F01P 2060/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258608 A2 20021120; EP 1258608 A3 20041201; EP 1258608 B1 20080604; BR 0201840 A 20030311; BR 0201840 B1 20101019; CN 1224777 C 20051026; CN 1385599 A 20021218; DE 60226923 D1 20080717; JP 2002339744 A 20021127; JP 3775571 B2 20060517; TW 554133 B 20030921

INPADOC legal status


2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110424

2012-02-23 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60226923

- Effective date: 20111101

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111101

2011-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110424

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100430

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100325

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-05-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090305

2008-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60226923 P 20080717

2008-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2008-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-06-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: YOSHINO, KOUJI

2008-06-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: AMAKAWA, YUTAKA

2005-08-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2005-03-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050119

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI