Global Patent Index - EP 1258620 A2

EP 1258620 A2 2002-11-20 - Method for desulfating an NOx absorber in internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Method for desulfating an NOx absorber in internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Desulfatisierung eines NOx-Speichers bei einem Verbrennungsmotor

Title (fr)

Méthode de désulfatation d'un piège à NOx dans un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1258620 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02007800 A

Priority

DE 10123682 A

Abstract (en)

In a process to remove sulfur from an automotive NOx storage trap operated in lean burn mode, a calculation model determines the sulfur removal steps. The steps are modified using information derived from a knock signal and the fuel anti-knock sensitivity, fuel consumption. The fuel consumption is determined during a lean burn phase of motor operation. The fuel consumption is determined since the previous sulfur removal cycle. A relationship is established between the knock-sensitivity and the fuel sulfur concentration. The relationship between knock-sensitivity and sulfur concentration is held in a memory device. A correctional parameter is determined using the knock-sensitivity and fuel consumption. This parameter is incorporated in the calculation model and is determines the sulfur removal process intervals.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Desulfatisierung eines NOx-Speichers bei einem Verbrennungsmotor, der zumindest zum Teil in einem Magermodus betrieben wird, wobei eine Modellrechnung zur Bestimmung eines Desulfatisierungsschrittes durchgeführt wird. Zur bedarfsgerechten Adaption der Desulfatisierungsschritte wird, vorgeschlagen, dass ein Klopfsignal oder eine Klopfregelung ausgewertet und eine Klopfempfindlichkeit des Kraftstoffes bestimmt wird, dass ein Kraftstoffverbrauch ausgewertet wird und dass die Modellberechung in Abhängigkeit von der Klopfempfindlichkeit des Kraftstoffes und dem Kraftstoffverbrauch durchgeführt wird.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/02; F01N 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/02 (2006.01); F01N 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/0842 (2013.01); F02D 35/027 (2013.01); F02D 41/028 (2013.01); F01N 2570/04 (2013.01); F02D 2200/0612 (2013.01); F02D 2200/0818 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258620 A2 20021120; EP 1258620 A3 20050413; EP 1258620 B1 20060712; AT 333040 T 20060815; DE 10123682 A1 20021219; DE 50207467 D1 20060824

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100407

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100406

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100406

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101230

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100406

2010-11-30 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090430

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-09-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060712

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070406

2009-08-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060712

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090606

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090429

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090429

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090407

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070406

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061013

2008-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE A.G.

- Effective date: 20070430

2007-12-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-06-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070413

2007-02-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2007-01-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-12-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-12-12 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061212

2006-11-15 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: PREUSS, FLORIAN

2006-11-15 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: DETTERBECK, STEFAN

2006-11-15 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: HASENCLEVER, HANNS-CHRISTIAN

2006-11-15 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: KEENAN, MATTHEW, DR.

2006-11-15 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: RAMATSCHI, STEPHAN

2006-11-15 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: MUELLER, PETER

2006-11-15 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHAEFER, HANS-VOLKER DR.

2006-10-31 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-10-23 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061023

2006-10-12 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061012

2006-10-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060918

2006-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50207467 P 20060824

2006-08-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-08-09 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: PREUSS, FLORIAN

2006-08-09 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: DETTERBECK, STEFAN

2006-08-09 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: HASENCLEVER, HANNS-CHRISTIAN

2006-08-09 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: KEENAN, MATTHEW, DR.

2006-08-09 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: RAMATSCHI, STEPHAN

2006-08-09 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: MUELLER, PETER

2006-08-09 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHAEFER, HANS-VOLKER DR.

2006-07-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-07-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-07-12 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060712

2006-07-12 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060712

2006-07-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060712

2006-07-12 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060712

2006-01-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-07-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050513

2005-04-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-04-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI