Global Patent Index - EP 1258627 A2

EP 1258627 A2 2002-11-20 - Fuel injection valve

Title (en)

Fuel injection valve

Title (de)

Brennstoffeinspritzventil

Title (fr)

Soupape d'injection de carburant

Publication

EP 1258627 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02010815 A

Priority

DE 10123860 A

Abstract (en)

The injection port bearer body (5a) has one or more injection ports (7) and is housed in the valve seat body (5) and made of material with lower thermoconductivity coefficient than the valve seat. The port bearer (5a) has thermoconductivity of less than 2 W/mk and withstands temperatures up to 200 degrees C. The bearer (5a) is best cast into the seat body (5) or injection-molded to this.

Abstract (de)

Ein Brennstoffeinspritzventil (1) für Brennstoffeinspritzanlagen von Brennkraftmaschinen weist einen Aktor (10) auf und eine von dem Aktor (10) betätigbare Ventilnadel (3) zur Betätigung eines Ventilschließkörpers (4), der zusammen mit einer an einem Ventilsitzkörper (5) ausgebildeten Ventilsitzfläche (6) einen Dichtsitz bildet. Ein Abspritzöffnungsträger (5a) mit zumindest einer Abspritzöffnung (7) ist in den Ventilsitzkörper (5) eingesetzt und besteht aus einem Material mit niedrigem Wärmeleitungskoeffizienten. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 51/06; F02M 61/16; F02M 61/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/188 (2013.01); F02M 61/18 (2013.01); F02M 61/1806 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19804463 A1 19990812 - DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258627 A2 20021120; EP 1258627 A3 20041201; DE 10123860 A1 20021128

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-09-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-08-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI