Global Patent Index - EP 1258627 A3

EP 1258627 A3 2004-12-01 - Fuel injection valve

Title (en)

Fuel injection valve

Title (de)

Brennstoffeinspritzventil

Title (fr)

Soupape d'injection de carburant

Publication

EP 1258627 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 02010815 A

Priority

DE 10123860 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1258627A2] The injection port bearer body (5a) has one or more injection ports (7) and is housed in the valve seat body (5) and made of material with lower thermoconductivity coefficient than the valve seat. The port bearer (5a) has thermoconductivity of less than 2 W/mk and withstands temperatures up to 200 degrees C. The bearer (5a) is best cast into the seat body (5) or injection-molded to this.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 51/06; F02M 61/16; F02M 61/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/188 (2013.01); F02M 61/18 (2013.01); F02M 61/1806 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258627 A2 20021120; EP 1258627 A3 20041201; DE 10123860 A1 20021128

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-09-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-08-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI