Global Patent Index - EP 1258628 A2

EP 1258628 A2 2002-11-20 - Fuel injection valve

Title (en)

Fuel injection valve

Title (de)

Brennstoffeinspritzventil

Title (fr)

Soupape d'injection de carburant

Publication

EP 1258628 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02010816 A

Priority

DE 10123867 A

Abstract (en)

The injection valve (1) has an auxiliary feed (40) parallel to the central feed (16) and linked up with the valve interior (46) through line system (44,47). The auxiliary feed has fitted filter (41) and feed connection (42) which connects to a distribution line and with this forms a sealed element (42). Line (44) lies within the cylinder head (34) and is led through (45) to the valve interior (46) where it issues downstream of the magnetic circuit (10). The auxiliary feed brings in a cleaning agent or fuel and agent mixed.

Abstract (de)

Ein Brennstoffeinspritzventil (1) für Brennstoffeinspritzanlagen von Brennkraftmaschinen umfaßt eine Magnetspule (10), eine mit der Magnetspule (10) in Wirkverbindung stehende und in einer Schließrichtung von einer Rückstellfeder (23) beaufschlagte Ventilnadel (3) zur Betätigung eines Ventilschließkörpers (4), der zusammen mit einer an einem Ventilsitzkörper (5) ausgebildeten Ventilsitzfläche (6) einen Dichtsitz bildet, zumindest zwei Abspritzöffnungen (7), die in dem Ventilsitzkörper (5) ausgebildet sind, und eine zentrale Brennstoffzufuhr (16). Das Brennstoffeinspritzventil (1) weist einen Hilfszulauf (40) auf, welcher über eine Leitung (44; 47) mit einem Innenraum (46) des Brennstoffeinspritzventils (1) in Verbindung steht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 51/06; F02M 43/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 43/04 (2006.01); F02M 51/06 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01); F02M 65/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 65/008 (2013.01); F02M 43/04 (2013.01); F02M 51/0671 (2013.01); F02M 61/165 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19804463 A1 19990812 - DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258628 A2 20021120; EP 1258628 A3 20041201; DE 10123867 A1 20021128

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-09-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-08-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI