Global Patent Index - EP 1258629 A2

EP 1258629 A2 2002-11-20 - Method for manufacturing a sealing for parts of an injection apparatus with an accumulator, and parts with such a sealing

Title (en)

Method for manufacturing a sealing for parts of an injection apparatus with an accumulator, and parts with such a sealing

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Dichtungsbereichen für Bauteile von Speichereinspritzvorrichtungen sowie Bauteilen mit derartigem Dichtungsbereich

Title (fr)

Procédé de réalisation d'un joint d'étanchéité pour des pièces d'un dispositif d'injection avec accumulateur, ainsi que des pièces avec ce joint d'étanchéité

Publication

EP 1258629 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02100470 A

Priority

DE 10123649 A

Abstract (en)

The sealing region is locally-deformed under mechanical pressure using a plunger (12). This produces a local and lasting increase in strength in the sealing region An Independent claim is included for The sealing region so formed.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Herstellung von Dichtungsbereichen (10) für Bauteile (1) von Speichereinspritzvorrichtungen. Das Verfahren umfasst den Schritt des Druckumformens des Dichtungsbereichs (10) mittels eines Stempels (12), um eine lokale, bleibende Festigkeitssteigerung am Dichtungsbereich (10) zu erzeugen. Weiterhin wird ein Bauteil mit einem derart hergestellten Dichtungsbereich (10) sowie eine Dichtungsanordnung zwischen dem Bauteil und einer Leitung bereitgestellt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 55/02; B21C 37/29; F02M 55/00; F02M 61/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 55/00 (2006.01); F02M 55/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 55/025 (2013.01); F02M 55/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258629 A2 20021120; EP 1258629 A3 20040310

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040911

2005-01-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-12-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-03-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-03-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 55/02 A

2004-03-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 55/00 B

2004-03-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 61/16 B

2004-03-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 21C 37/29 B

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI