Global Patent Index - EP 1258630 A1

EP 1258630 A1 2002-11-20 - Fuel injector assembly

Title (en)

Fuel injector assembly

Title (de)

Kraftstoffeinspritzventil-Zusammenbau

Title (fr)

Assemblage d'injecteur de combustible

Publication

EP 1258630 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02009836 A

Priority

LU 90777 A

Abstract (en)

A fuel rail and injector assembly comprises a fuel delivery rail (14), a fuel injector (12) having an inner fuel delivery channel (22) and a mounting end (10), and mounting means (16) for mounting said fuel injector (12) to said fuel delivery rail (14), said mounting means being arranged on said fuel delivery rail. According to the invention, the said mounting means comprise a fitting (20) which is insertable into said fuel delivery channel (22) of said fuel injector, and clip means (28, 30) extending along an outer surface of said mounting end of said fuel injector when said fuel injector is mounted on said fuel delivery rail, said clip means for co-operating with retaining means (32) on said outer surface of said mounting end of said injector. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 69/46; F02M 55/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 55/00 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01); F02M 69/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/168 (2013.01); F02M 55/004 (2013.01); F02M 69/465 (2013.01); F02M 2200/853 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258630 A1 20021120; LU 90777 A1 20021118

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070209

2005-06-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050418

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-03-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI