Global Patent Index - EP 1258636 A1

EP 1258636 A1 2002-11-20 - Fan rotor and fan, particularly a radial fan

Title (en)

Fan rotor and fan, particularly a radial fan

Title (de)

Lüfterrad sowie Lüfter, insbesondere Radiallüfter

Title (fr)

Rotor ventilateur et ventilateur, en particulier ventilateur radial

Publication

EP 1258636 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02004839 A

Priority

DE 20108218 U

Abstract (en)

A ventilator fan unit has a housing at the centre of which is an electric motor with an upright shaft. In plan view the housing has a ring-shaped outer panel which translates at approx. the mid-point to a shallow V-shaped ring with flange at the centre of which is the motor housing. The motor stands proud of the ring. The ring has a number of drain hole detents at the interface between the motor housing and the ring flange.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Lüfterrad, insbesondere Radiallüfterrad, mit mehreren Schaufeln (4) und mit einer stirnseitigen, insbesondere die Schaufeln (4) verbindenden, im westlichen kreisförmigen, im wesentlichen senkrecht zu einer Längsachse (X-X) des Lüfterrades (2) angeordneten Deckscheibe (5). Vom Innendurchmesser (Dl) der kreisförmigen Deckscheibe (5) ragt eine rohrförmige Aufnahme (3) für einen das Lüfterrad (2) treibenden Motor (1) ab, deren Mantel (6) koaxial zur Längsachse (X-X) verläuft. Im Mantel (6) der rohrförmigen Aufnahme (3) für den Motor (1) sind radial nach außen gewölbte Ausbuchtungen (14) angeordnet, die sich über die gesamte Länge (L) der Aufnahme (3) erstrecken. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/28; F04D 25/06; F04D 29/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 25/06 (2006.01); F04D 29/28 (2006.01); F04D 29/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/701 (2013.01); F04D 25/0613 (2013.01); F04D 29/282 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20108218 U1 20020926; AT 267959 T 20040615; EP 1258636 A1 20021120; EP 1258636 B1 20040526; ES 2220845 T3 20041216; HK 1049687 A1 20041217

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180326

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20180326

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-05-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50200474

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE STAEGER & SPERLING PARTNERSCHAF, DE

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180326

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-03-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041026

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *EBM-PAPST MULFINGEN G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20050331

2006-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2005-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *EBM-PAPST MULFINGEN G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-05-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050304

2005-03-04 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050304

2005-03-04 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050304

2004-12-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-12-17 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1049687

2004-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2220845 T3

2004-12-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-09-14 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-08-26 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040826

2004-08-26 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040826

2004-07-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50200474 P 20040701

2004-06-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-05-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-05-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-26 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040526

2004-05-26 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040526

2004-05-26 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040526

2004-03-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: EBM-PAPST MULFINGEN GMBH & CO.KG

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021115

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI