Global Patent Index - EP 1258673 A2

EP 1258673 A2 2002-11-20 - Protective grill for use with a working light

Title (en)

Protective grill for use with a working light

Title (de)

Schutzkorb für Arbeitsleuchte

Title (fr)

Grille de protection pour lampe de travail

Publication

EP 1258673 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02009380 A

Priority

CN 01223444 U

Abstract (en)

A protective grill (40) for use with a working light (10), wherein at least one end of an aligning rod (41) is installed with a U-shaped hook portion (42), and the free end of such U-shaped hook portion (42) is located on the front side; thus the present invention, with the design of the U-shaped hook portion (42), enables manufacturers to produce protective grills without considering the degree of precision, also the protective grills of the present invention can be installed easily and hard to be loosened from the working lights the protective grills attach to.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 15/02 (2013.01); F21W 2131/1005 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258673 A2 20021120; EP 1258673 A3 20060215; CA 2386343 A1 20021115; CN 2474897 Y 20020130

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-30 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061129

2006-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060718

2006-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060425

2006-02-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-02-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI