Global Patent Index - EP 1258676 A2

EP 1258676 A2 2002-11-20 - Gas burner head

Title (en)

Gas burner head

Title (de)

Brennerkopf eines Gasbrenners

Title (fr)

Tête de brûleur à gaz

Publication

EP 1258676 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02009638 A

Priority

DE 10124013 A

Abstract (en)

The burner head (2), for a gas burner (1), is an aluminum injection molding. At least the upper outer side (8) of the burner head is coated with an enamel layer (12). The enamel can be black, gray and especially an anthracite gray, brown or beige and especially light beige. The burner cover (4) also has an enamel layer coating.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Brennerkopf eines Gasbrenners aus Aluminium-Spritzguss. Zumindest die obere Außenseite des Brennerkopfes ist mit einer Emailleschicht bedeckt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 14/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/06 (2013.01); F23D 2900/14061 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258676 A2 20021120; EP 1258676 A3 20030402; EP 1258676 B1 20060830; DE 10124013 A1 20021121; DE 50207973 D1 20061012; US 2002172906 A1 20021121

INPADOC legal status


2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2007-08-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-04-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070419

- Year of fee payment: 6

2007-03-28 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20060830

2006-10-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50207973 P 20061012

2006-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2006-08-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-08-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060830

2006-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060830

2004-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030422

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI