Global Patent Index - EP 1258680 A3

EP 1258680 A3 2004-12-29 - Safety module for fuel-burning appliance, and appliance using such a module

Title (en)

Safety module for fuel-burning appliance, and appliance using such a module

Title (de)

Sicherheitsmodul für einen Brenner und Gerät mit solchem Modul

Title (fr)

Module de sécurité pour un brûleur et un appareil utilisant un tel module

Publication

EP 1258680 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 02253449 A

Priority

  • GB 0111971 A
  • US 15774602 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1258680A2] The invention provides a safety module (1) for connection to a fuel-burning appliance (11). The safety module connects to the existing circuitry of the appliance and triggers an alarm response when certain predetermined conditions are met. The safety module includes a CO sensor (3) and processing means (4) and can respond not only to acutely high CO levels but also to chronically high CO levels and lack of adherence to service schedules amongst other conditions. Means (7) are provided whereby the safety module (1) can be programmed/reset. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23N 5/24; F23N 5/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/24 (2006.01); F23N 5/26 (2006.01); F23N 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/242 (2013.01); F23N 5/265 (2013.01); F23N 5/003 (2013.01); F23N 2031/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258680 A2 20021120; EP 1258680 A3 20041229; GB 0111971 D0 20010704; GB 2375646 A 20021120; US 2004045543 A1 20040311; US 7021925 B2 20060404

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091201

2007-05-16 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Free text: DEDKESFRGB

- Effective date: 20060727

2007-05-16 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Free text: ATBECHCYDEDKESFIFRGBGRIEITLUMCNLPTSETR

- Effective date: 20070402

2006-08-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INVENSYS CONTROLS UK LIMITED

2005-09-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-08-20 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20030513

2003-07-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030513

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI