Global Patent Index - EP 1258685 A1

EP 1258685 A1 2002-11-20 - Household appliance, in particular cooking oven

Title (en)

Household appliance, in particular cooking oven

Title (de)

Haushaltsgerät, insbesondere Backofen

Title (fr)

Appareil ménager, en particulier four de cuisson

Publication

EP 1258685 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02006952 A

Priority

DE 10124458 A

Abstract (en)

The carriage (11) is pulled out by a spring (13) and run back in by the spring using less force than even for partial withdrawal. The withdrawal force of the spring (15) is reduced by a linkage (22) when the carriage is run in, the linkage composed of levers (22-26) forming an approximate rectangle. The first diagonal (29) of the rectangle runs parallel to the withdrawal direction (15) as against a second diagonal (28) which houses a tensile spring (29) used to tension the linkage levers. The oven door is held closed by the force of the spring (13) by element (18) which in turn is reduced in power by the actuating unit (20) when opening the door.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung geht aus von einem Haushaltsgerät, insbesondere einem Backofen, mit einem Wagen (11) und einer Tür (12) sowie einer Federvorrichtung (13, 14). Um ein Haushaltsgerät mit einem gesteigerten Komfort bei gleichzeitig geringem konstruktiven Aufwand bereitzustellen, wird vorgeschlagen, daß der Wagen (11), angetrieben durch eine Kraft der Federvorrichtung (13, 14) ausfahrbar ist, und die Federvorrichtung (13, 14) im eingefahrenen Zustand des Wagens (11) mit einer kleineren Kraft in Ausfahrrichtung (15) auf den Wagen (11) wirkt als bei einem zumindest teilweise ausgefahrenen Zustand des Wagens (11). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/162 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4023949 A1 19910822 - BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]

Citation (search report)

  • [DA] EP 0443329 A2 19910828 - BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 011, no. 335 (P - 632) 4 November 1987 (1987-11-04)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 10 31 August 1998 (1998-08-31)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258685 A1 20021120; EP 1258685 B1 20061227; DE 10124458 A1 20021121; DE 50209047 D1 20070208; ES 2278826 T3 20070816

INPADOC legal status


2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080327

2009-05-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080327

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061227

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070817

2007-12-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070928

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061227

2007-08-17 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2278826 T3

2007-07-25 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20061227

2007-03-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070331

- Year of fee payment: 6

2007-03-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070327

2007-03-23 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070323

- Year of fee payment: 6

2007-02-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50209047 P 20070208

2006-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2006-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: SI

2006-12-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-12-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061227

2006-05-24 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20030520

- Countries: AL

2006-05-24 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20030520

- Countries: LT

2006-05-24 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20030520

- Countries: LV

2006-05-24 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20030520

- Countries: MK

2006-05-24 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20030520

- Countries: RO

2006-05-24 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20030520

- Countries: SI

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2003-09-17 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20030520

- Countries: SI

2003-08-13 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030520

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI