Global Patent Index - EP 1258689 A2

EP 1258689 A2 2002-11-20 - Air conditioning device with remote controller

Title (en)

Air conditioning device with remote controller

Title (de)

Klimaanlage mit einem Fernbedienungselement

Title (fr)

Dispositif de conditionnement d'air avec commande à distance

Publication

EP 1258689 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02010765 A

Priority

ES 200101173 A

Abstract (en)

In accordance with its position (A) remote from the plant, or its position (B) on the plant, the location of symbols on the display screen (19) of the remote control unit (3) is varied.

Abstract (de)

Klimaanlage mit einem Fernbedienungselement 3, umfassend mindestens ein Anzeigefeld 19 zur Anzeige von Zeichen, mit welchem Fernbedienungselement 3 Signale auf die Klimaanlage 1 übertragbar sind. Die Anzeigestellung der Zeichen im Anzeigefeld 19 ist in Abhängigkeit von der Position des Fernbedienungselementes 3 veränderbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 11/30 (2018.01); F24F 11/56 (2018.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258689 A2 20021120; EP 1258689 A3 20040114; DE 20221914 U1 20090226; ES 2200638 A1 20040301; ES 2200638 B1 20050501

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080916

2008-10-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2004-10-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-09-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040714

2004-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI