Global Patent Index - EP 1258692 A1

EP 1258692 A1 2002-11-20 - Crop dryer

Title (en)

Crop dryer

Title (de)

Ernteguttrockner

Title (fr)

Sécheur de récoltes

Publication

EP 1258692 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02253480 A

Priority

GB 0112040 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention provides a bespoke dehumidifying apparatus which serves to cool and remove moisture from air used in the drying of produce and root crops. The air is used to dry produce and root crops following a washing step during the processing of the crop, the washing step being an inherent step in the post harvest preparation of root crops and produce for packaging, distribution and sale. The invention provides an improved heat pump de-humidifier which further contains a first sub-cooling component which further cools the air once it has passed through the dehumidifier, this sub-cooling resulting in further moisture being condensed out of the air on to the cooling coil, where after the moisture can be collected and dispensed. The air can be further exposed to a heating component which warms the processed "dry" air, this heating resulting in the air then being more suitable for exposure to root crops and produce to effect their drying. A method of drying root crops and produce using the apparatus provided by the invention is further provided. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F26B 21/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F26B 21/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 21/086 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258692 A1 20021120; GB 0112040 D0 20010711

INPADOC legal status


2007-07-18 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070130

2006-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-12-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041103

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030520

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI