Global Patent Index - EP 1258693 A1

EP 1258693 A1 2002-11-20 - Process and apparatus for drying sawn timber

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for drying sawn timber

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Trocknen von Schnittholz

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour le séchage de bois de sciage

Publication

EP 1258693 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02010640 A

Priority

DE 10124555 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10124555C1] Method has the stacked sawn timber transported via rail-mounted transport carriages (5) through a convection drying chamber (1) provided with fans (2) for circulation of the gaseous drying medium transverse to the transport direction. Loaded transport carriage is provided on the outside of drying chamber with a sealing device, for separating drying medium flows fed through different sections of sawn timber stack in opposite directions. An Independent claim for a sealing device for fixing to a sawn timber stack transported through a drying chamber is also included.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung sieht bei einem Verfahren zum Trocknen von gestapeltem Schnitzholz (8) oder ähnlichem Gut in einer Trockenkammer (1) vor, dass eine Dichtvorrichtung außerhalb der Trockenkammer an einem mit Stapelpaketen (7) fertigbeladenen Gleiswagen (5) befestigt und zusammen mit diesem in die Trockenkammer eingefahren wird. Hierdurch werden in einfacher und kostengünstiger sowie praxisgerechter Weise unerwünschte Wege, Kurzschlüsse und Inhogeminitäten der Trockenmittelströmung vermieden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F26B 25/06; F26B 21/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F26B 21/02 (2006.01); F26B 25/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 25/063 (2013.01); F26B 21/028 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19801162 C1 19990923 - BRUNNER REINHARD [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258693 A1 20021120; EP 1258693 B1 20070711; AT 366902 T 20070815; DE 10124555 C1 20021107; DE 50210436 D1 20070823

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-01-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090511

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2009-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090119

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080514

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080521

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-06-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080414

2008-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070711

2007-12-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-08-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50210436 P 20070823

2007-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-07-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI NL

2003-09-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-09-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021129

2003-09-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI NL

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI