Global Patent Index - EP 1258697 A1

EP 1258697 A1 2002-11-20 - Container for propellant charge modules

Title (en)

Container for propellant charge modules

Title (de)

Behälter für eine Anzahl Treibladungen

Title (fr)

Conteneur pour modules de charge propulsive

Publication

EP 1258697 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02290966 A

Priority

FR 0106493 A

Abstract (en)

The container (1) consists of a rigid tubular body (2) to isolate propulsive charge modules (11) during transport, having an inner plastic sleeve (7) to receive the modules and locking members to hold them in place by deforming the sleeve. The locking members are in the form of lugs between the tubular body and sleeve, actuated by a control bar and springs. The body also has a lengthwise slot (3) for an implement used to fill the sleeve with the charge modules.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un conteneur 1 pour modules 11 de charge propulsive pour le chargement d'une arme à l'aide de moyens de transport. Il comprend un moyen de protection isolant lesdits modules des moyens de transport, constitué d'un corps tubulaire 2 rigide, d'une gaine 7 de réception des modules 11 et d'un moyen de blocage des modules dans la gaine. La gaine 7 est réalisée en un matériau déformable. Le moyen de blocage assure la déformation de la gaine 7 pour immobiliser les modules. Application au convoyage de modules de charge. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 39/00; F41A 9/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 9/38 (2006.01); F42B 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 39/00 (2013.01); F41A 9/38 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

FR 2764055 A1 19981204 - GIAT IND SA [FR]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258697 A1 20021120; FR 2824899 A1 20021122; FR 2824899 B1 20031003; US 2002170421 A1 20021121; US 6769345 B2 20040803

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-16 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050924

2004-08-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040624

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021227

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI