Global Patent Index - EP 1258775 A2

EP 1258775 A2 2002-11-20 - Photothermographic materials and recording processes therefor

Title (en)

Photothermographic materials and recording processes therefor

Title (de)

Photothermographische Materialien und Aufzeichnungsverfahren dafür

Title (fr)

Matériaux thermographiques et procédé d'enregistrement utilisant de tels matériaux

Publication

EP 1258775 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02100246 A

Priority

  • EP 02100246 A
  • EP 01000097 A

Abstract (en)

A photothermographic recording material comprising a support and a photo-addressable thermally developable element, the photo-addressable thermally developable element containing a mixture of a substantially light-insensitive silver salt of a monocarboxylic acid and a substantially light-insensitive compound exclusive of silver succinate represented by formula (I): €ƒ€ƒ€ƒ€ƒ€ƒ€ƒ€ƒ€ƒ AgOOC-R 1 -COOAg wherein R 1 is a straight chain saturated or unsaturated hydrocarbon group with two or three carbon atoms, optionally substituted with one or more of =O, =S, =CR 2 R 3 , an alkyl group, an aryl group, an amino group, a substituted amino group, a cycloalkyl group, a hydroxy group, a thiol group, an alkyl sulphone group, an aryl sulphone group, an alkoxy group, an acyloxy group, a thioalkyl group, a thioaryl, a carbamic ester group, a halogen atom or a-(C=O)R 4 group; wherein if R 1 is substituted with two substituents selected from the group consisting of alkyl, thioalkyl, substituted amino and alkoxy groups the two substituents may jointly comprise the atoms necessary to complete a carbocyclic or heterocyclic ring; R 2 and R 3 are independently hydrogen or an alkyl, substituted alkyl, hydroxy or thiol; R 4 is a hydroxy, -OAg, alkoxy, alkyl or-NHR 6 group; R 6 is hydrogen or an alkyl group; an organic reducing agent for the mixture of substantially light-insensitive organic silver salts in thermal working relationship therewith, a photosensitive silver halide in catalytic association with said mixture of substantially light-insensitive organic silver salts, and a binder; a photothermographic recording process therewith.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 1/498

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/498 (2006.01); B29D 23/00 (2006.01); B29D 23/18 (2006.01); C08F 210/16 (2006.01); F16L 11/112 (2006.01); F16L 11/115 (2006.01); A61K 47/00 (2006.01); B29K 83/00 (2006.01); B29L 23/18 (2006.01); C08F 214/06 (2006.01); C09J 151/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/015 (2013.01); G03C 1/49809 (2013.01); G03C 1/4989 (2013.01); G03C 2200/42 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258775 A2 20021120; EP 1258775 A3 20060726

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-27 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090225

2008-04-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA HEALTHCARE NV

2007-04-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA HEALTHCARE NV

2007-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070126

2006-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2006-07-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G03C 1/498 20060101AFI20020813BHEP

2006-07-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C08F 210/16 20060101ALI20060622BHEP

2006-07-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 47/00 20060101ALN20060622BHEP

2006-07-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C09J 151/06 20060101ALN20060622BHEP

2006-07-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C08F 214/06 20060101ALN20060622BHEP

2006-07-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B29K 83/00 20060101ALN20060622BHEP

2006-07-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B29L 23/18 20060101ALN20060622BHEP

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI