Global Patent Index - EP 1258786 A1

EP 1258786 A1 2002-11-20 - Self-compensating spring for a mechanical oscillator of balance-spring type

Title (en)

Self-compensating spring for a mechanical oscillator of balance-spring type

Title (de)

Selbstkompensierende Feder für einen mechanischen Oszillator vom Unruh-Spiralfeder-Typ

Title (fr)

Spiral auto-compensateur pour oscillateur mécanique balancier-spiral

Publication

EP 1258786 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01810497 A

Priority

EP 01810497 A

Abstract (en)

A self-balancing spring for a mechanical balance spring oscillator of a watch movement or other precision instrument, in a paramagnetic Nb-Hf alloy has a thermal coefficient of Youngs modulus (CTE) such that it essentially allows the annulment of the following expression: 1/E asterisk dE/dT+3 alpha s-2 alpha b where: E : Youngs modulus for the spring of the oscillator 1/E asterisk dE/dT = CTE = thermal coefficient of Youngs modulus of the oscillator spring alpha s : coefficient of thermal dilation of the oscillator spring alpha b : coefficient of dilation of the balance wheel of the oscillator. The alloy contains between 2% and 30% atomic of Hf.

Abstract (fr)

Ce spiral autocompensateur pour oscillateur mécanique balancier-spiral de mouvement d'horlogerie ou autre instrument de précision, en alliage paramagnétique Nb-Hf possédant un coefficient thermique du module de Young (CTE) tel, qu'il permet d'annuler substantiellement l'expression: ((1) / (E))((dE) / (dT))+3s -2b avec: E: module de Young du spiral de l'oscillateur, (1/E) (dE/dT) = CTE = coefficient thermique du module de Young du spiral de l'oscillateur, s : coefficient de dilatation thermique du spiral de l'oscillateur, b : coefficient de dilatation du balancier de l'oscillateur, contient entre 2% et 30% at. de Hf. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 17/22; C22C 27/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 27/02 (2006.01); G04B 17/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 27/02 (2013.01); G04B 17/227 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258786 A1 20021120; EP 1258786 B1 20080220; DE 1258786 T1 20030814; DE 60132878 D1 20080403; DE 60132878 T2 20090326; JP 2003004866 A 20030108; JP 2010044090 A 20100225; JP 4813742 B2 20111109; US 2002180130 A1 20021205; US 6705601 B2 20040316

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170517

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-12-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ROLEX SA, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ROLEX SA, CH

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150518

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151201

2016-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160129

2016-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150518

2015-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60132878

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140602

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140509

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140520

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-01-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081121

2008-05-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20080421

2008-04-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60132878 P 20080403

2008-03-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-03-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MOINAS & SAVOYE SA

2008-02-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2008-02-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061227

2003-08-14 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2003-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030123

2003-02-19 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

2003-02-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROLEX SA

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI