Global Patent Index - EP 1258841 A2

EP 1258841 A2 2002-11-20 - Magnetic sensor and bill validator using the same

Title (en)

Magnetic sensor and bill validator using the same

Title (de)

Magnetischer Sensor und damit ausgestattete Banknotenüberprüfungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Capteur magnétique et dispositif de validation de billets de banque utilisant ce capteur

Publication

EP 1258841 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02010180 A

Priority

  • JP 2001146215 A
  • JP 2002066472 A

Abstract (en)

A highly sensitive magnetic sensor and a bill validator using the magnetic sensor are disclosed. The magnetic sensor is provided with an artificial-lattice MR (magnetic resistor) element formed on a board. The artificial-lattice MR element and wiring terminals, coupled to the artificial-lattice MR element, are integrated in a housing with resin. Moreover, a magnet is mounted in a hollow at the back of the board in the housing to provide a plane of artificial-lattice MR element with an auxiliary magnetic field perpendicularly.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 7/04; G01R 33/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 27/72 (2006.01); G07D 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 7/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258841 A2 20021120; EP 1258841 A3 20040107; EP 1258841 B1 20080416; CN 1178175 C 20041201; CN 1385816 A 20021218; DE 60226092 D1 20080529; DE 60226092 T2 20090702; ES 2304406 T3 20081016; JP 2003035701 A 20030207; JP 3603872 B2 20041222

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140515

2015-06-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150626

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140514

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-02-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60226092

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140514

2014-12-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60226092

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130515

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130508

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120518

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080416

2009-03-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090119

2008-11-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PANASONIC CORPORATION

2008-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2304406 T3

2008-05-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60226092 P 20080529

2008-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2004-12-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041105

2004-09-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2004-05-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040315

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 07D 7/04 A

2004-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01R 33/09 B

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI