Global Patent Index - EP 1258842 A2

EP 1258842 A2 2002-11-20 - Self-service terminal

Title (en)

Self-service terminal

Title (de)

Selbstbedienungsterminal

Title (fr)

Terminal libre-service

Publication

EP 1258842 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02252487 A

Priority

GB 0111991 A

Abstract (en)

A self-service terminal (10) for receiving disposable containers (100) of valuable media items (108) is described. The terminal comprises: a breaching mechanism (124) for providing an opening in the containers (100); and an emptying mechanism (122) for removing valuable media from the opening in the containers. The terminal further comprises a secure area (50) in which containers are received and opened; and an item storage area (52) in which individual media items are stacked for removal. A dispenser (40) for receiving valuable media items stored in a disposable container (100) is also described. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 11/0096 (2013.01); G07D 11/0057 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258842 A2 20021120; EP 1258842 A3 20040407; GB 0111991 D0 20010704; US 2004016034 A1 20040122

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050823

2005-04-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050222

2004-12-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-12-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041007

2004-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-04-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI