Global Patent Index - EP 1258849 A2

EP 1258849 A2 2002-11-20 - Anti-intrusion detecting device

Title (en)

Anti-intrusion detecting device

Title (de)

Eindringschutzmeldevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Système de détection anti-intrusion

Publication

EP 1258849 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02076918 A

Priority

IT MI20011043 A

Abstract (en)

An anti-intrusion detecting device (1), especially for doors and windows, to be applied on the outside of buildings, presenting a typically parallelepiped shape, where the larger side is placed horizontally over the opening (40) to be protected; the detector (1) incorporates two sensors (2,3) each of which functions in accordance with a different detection principle and each of which covers different volumes (44, 45) and areas (4, 5) of sensitivity. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 29/18; G08B 13/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/24 (2006.01); G08B 29/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 29/183 (2013.01); G08B 13/2494 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258849 A2 20021120; EP 1258849 A3 20040114; EP 1258849 B1 20080206; DE 60224901 D1 20080320; IT MI20011043 A1 20021118; IT MI20011043 D0 20010518

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080206

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081128

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080507

2009-01-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081107

2008-11-28 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2008-03-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60224901 P 20080320

2008-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2007-08-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G08B 13/24 20060101AFI20070629BHEP

2007-02-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070109

2004-10-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-09-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040708

2004-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI