Global Patent Index - EP 1258859 A1

EP 1258859 A1 2002-11-20 - Method for a segmented inverse gamma correction for a plasma display panel

Title (en)

Method for a segmented inverse gamma correction for a plasma display panel

Title (de)

Verfahren zur segmentierten invertierten Gammakorrektur für eine Plasmaanzeigetafel

Title (fr)

Procédé segmenté pour correction inverse de gamma pour un panneau d'affichage à plasma

Publication

EP 1258859 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01112260 A

Priority

EP 01112260 A

Abstract (en)

A process of effecting various anti compensation processes on input image on a plasma display panel comprises the steps of a) performing a gamma (i.e., gamma equal to 0.45) compensation process on a video signal received by the PDP with respect to a gamma ; b) dividing the video signal into at least two segments based on a gray level thereof; and c) performing a variety of anti compensation processes on the video signal in respective segment. A smaller gamma is used in the anti compensation process with respect to the video signal in a range of low gray level for increasing the gray level in the range of low gray level. Similarly, a larger gamma is used in the anti compensation process with respect to the video signal in a range of high gray level for increasing a gradient in the range of high gray level, thereby obtaining a sharp image contrast, improving image quality, and rendering an enhanced image brightness. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09G 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/20 (2006.01); G09G 3/28 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/2007 (2013.01); G09G 3/28 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0271 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0276 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258859 A1 20021120; EP 1258859 B1 20150708

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180212

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180301

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170525

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170406

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170526

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-06 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20160411

2016-04-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-04-11 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60149437

2015-12-16 [REG NL FP] TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY)

2015-08-20 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 60149437

2015-07-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2015-07-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2015-03-11 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20150211

2013-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CPT TECHNOLOGY (GROUP) CO., LTD.

2007-12-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071115

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2003-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030319

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI