Global Patent Index - EP 1258865 A2

EP 1258865 A2 2002-11-20 - Device for improving the intelligibility of audio signals containing speech

Title (en)

Device for improving the intelligibility of audio signals containing speech

Title (de)

Schaltungsanordnung zur Verbesserung der Verständlichkeit von Sprache enthaltenden Audiosignalen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour améliorer l'intelligibilité de signaux audio contenant de la parole

Publication

EP 1258865 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02005495 A

Priority

DE 10124699 A

Abstract (en)

A variable high-pass filter (VHPF) (20) can be altered in its cut-off frequency (fc), for which purpose it has a controlling input where a control signal can be applied to alter the cut-off frequency. A low-pass filter (10) feeds an audio signal for improvement to the VHPF and an input terminal (1) sets up the audio signal. At the output of the VHPF there is an amplifier stage (30) to amplify the output signal from the VHPF by a factor (g) between 1.5 and 4.

Abstract (de)

Die Sprachverständlichkeit eines Audiosignal bei unveränderter Lautstärke wird verbessert, in dem das gesamte Audiosignal um einen konstanten Faktor angehoben und die Amplitude dieses angehobenen Signales durch einen Hochpass abgesenkt wird. Die Eckfrequenz fc des Hochpasses wird dabei so geregelt, dass die Ausgangsamplitude des Audiosignals am Ende der Verarbeitungsstrecke gleich oder proportional der Eingangsamplitude des Audiosignals ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10L 21/02; H03G 5/16; H04R 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 3/04 (2006.01); G10L 13/00 (2006.01); G10L 21/02 (2013.01); H04S 7/00 (2006.01); G10L 21/0232 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 21/0364 (2013.01); G10L 21/0232 (2013.01); H04R 2225/43 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258865 A2 20021120; EP 1258865 A3 20040506; EP 1258865 B1 20061018; DE 10124699 C1 20021219; DE 50208467 D1 20061130; JP 2003018691 A 20030117; JP 4141736 B2 20080827; US 2002173950 A1 20021121; US 7418379 B2 20080826

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-11-16 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160401

2015-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150326

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-01-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50208467

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50208467

2013-09-18 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20130916

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130327

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-12-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ENTROPIC COMMUNICATIONS, INC., US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: TRIDENT MICROSYSTEMS (FAR EAST) LTD., GRAND CAYMAN, KY

- Document: DE 50208467

- Effective date: 20121023

2012-12-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ENTROPIC COMMUNICATIONS, INC., SAN DIEGO, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: TRIDENT MICROSYSTEMS (FAR EAST) LTD., GRAND CAYMAN, KY

- Document: DE 50208467

- Effective date: 20121023

2012-12-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50208467

- Representative's name: EPPING HERMANN FISCHER, PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCH, DE

- Effective date: 20121023

2012-10-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50208467

- Representative's name: EPPING HERMANN FISCHER, PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCH, DE

2012-03-29 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 50208467

- Effective date: 20110426

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110311

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110311

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-12-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110311

2011-04-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ENTROPIC COMMUNICATIONS, INC., SAN DIEGO, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MICRONAS GMBH, 79108 FREIBURG, DE

- Document: DE 50208467

- Effective date: 20110210

2010-12-24 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2010-12-22 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20101125 AND 20101201

2010-10-20 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20101011

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100326

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100322

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100402

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-09-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070719

2007-05-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-11-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50208467 P 20061130

2006-11-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20061018

2006-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2006-10-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-10-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061018

2005-08-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2005-06-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050506

2005-01-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2004-08-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040603

2004-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-05-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 10L 21/02 A

2004-05-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 03G 5/16 B

2004-05-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04R 25/00 B

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI