Global Patent Index - EP 1258876 A2

EP 1258876 A2 2002-11-20 - Data cartridge detector

Title (en)

Data cartridge detector

Title (de)

Datenkassette detektor

Title (fr)

Détecteur de cassette de données

Publication

EP 1258876 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02250915 A

Priority

US 81423601 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2002136100A1] An apparatus and method for detecting a data cartridge in a cartridge engaging assembly. A signal emitter may be positioned adjacent the cartridge engaging assembly to emit a signal. A signal detector mounted to the cartridge engaging assembly may detect the signal. The signal detector generates output to indicate whether the data cartridge is present in the cartridge engaging assembly based on the detected signal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11B 17/22; G11B 15/68; G11B 19/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11B 15/68 (2006.01); G11B 17/22 (2006.01); G11B 17/28 (2006.01); G11B 19/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11B 19/10 (2013.01); G11B 15/68 (2013.01); G11B 17/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

US 2002136100 A1 20020926; US 6693858 B2 20040217; EP 1258876 A2 20021120; EP 1258876 A3 20030625; JP 2002304794 A 20021018; US 2004114477 A1 20040617

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090303

2006-08-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040407

2004-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040407

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030908

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI