Global Patent Index - EP 1258900 A3

EP 1258900 A3 20050921 - Surface discharge type plasma display panel

Title (en)

Surface discharge type plasma display panel

Title (de)

Plasmabildschirm vom Oberflächenentladungstyp

Title (fr)

Panneau d'affichage à plasma du type à décharge de surface

Publication

EP 1258900 A3 20050921 (DE)

Application

EP 02100370 A 20020412

Priority

DE 10118531 A 20010414

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10118531A1] The plasma image screen has a carrier plate and a front plate separated from one another via a ribbed structure, dividing the space between them into separate gas-filled spaces and an electrode array with pairs of gas discharge electrodes lying on both sides of a gas discharge channel, applied to the front plate. The electrode array is covered by a transparent dielectric layer (4) having a capacitance which varies in a direction transverse to the gas discharge channel direction.

IPC 1-7

H01J 17/04; H01J 17/49

IPC 8 full level

H01J 11/12 (2012.01); H01J 11/38 (2012.01)

CPC (source: EP)

H01J 11/12 (2013.01); H01J 11/38 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0860849 A2 19980826 - NIPPON ELECTRIC CO [JP]
  • [X] EP 1024516 A1 20000802 - MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP [JP]
  • [X] DATABASE WPI Section PQ Week 200106, Derwent World Patents Index; Class P85, AN 2001-044981, XP002337847 & PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 14 5 March 2001 (2001-03-05)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 02 29 February 1996 (1996-02-29)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 13 30 November 1999 (1999-11-30)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

DOCDB simple family (publication)

DE 10118531 A1 20021017; EP 1258900 A2 20021120; EP 1258900 A3 20050921; JP 2002324489 A 20021108; US 2002167279 A1 20021114

DOCDB simple family (application)

DE 10118531 A 20010414; EP 02100370 A 20020412; JP 2002110673 A 20020412; US 12279302 A 20020412