Global Patent Index - EP 1258902 A2

EP 1258902 A2 2002-11-20 - Plasma display panel with improved white colour-point

Title (en)

Plasma display panel with improved white colour-point

Title (de)

Plasmabildschirm mit verbessertem Weissfarbpunkt

Title (fr)

Panneau d'affichage à plasma ayant un point de couleur blanche amélioré

Publication

EP 1258902 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02100444 A

Priority

DE 10122287 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10122287A1] Plasma TV screen comprises a front plate (1) having a glass plate (3) on which a dielectric layer (4) and a protective layer (5) are applied; a support plate (2) equipped with a luminescent layer (10); a ribbed structure (13) which divides the space between the front plate and the support plate into plasma cells filled with a gas; and electrode arrays (6, 7, 11) arranged on the front plate and the support plate to produce quiet electrical discharges in the cells. The front plate has a blue layer on the side facing the plasma cells. Preferred Features: The blue layer is the protective layer or the dielectric layer and is parallel to the electrodes on the front plate. The blue layer contains colored particles made from CoAl2O4 and ultramarine.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Plasmabildschirm mit einem verbesserten Weißfarbpunkt. Die Frontplatte (1) des Plasmabildschirms weist auf der der Plasmaentladung zugewandten Seite eine blaue Schicht auf. Dies kann die dielektrische Schicht (4), die Schutzschicht (5) oder eine zusätzliche Schicht (14) sein. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 17/49; H01J 5/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 11/12 (2012.01); H01J 11/38 (2012.01); H01J 11/40 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 11/38 (2013.01); H01J 11/12 (2013.01); H01J 11/40 (2013.01); H01J 2211/44 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258902 A2 20021120; EP 1258902 A3 20060510; CN 1389893 A 20030108; DE 10122287 A1 20021114; JP 2002358893 A 20021213; KR 20020085807 A 20021116; TW 584876 B 20040421; US 2003038598 A1 20030227; US 6700324 B2 20040302

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2007-06-27 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061201

2007-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2006-07-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH

2006-07-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2006-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2006-05-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01J 17/49 20060101AFI20020927BHEP

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI