Global Patent Index - EP 1258941 A2

EP 1258941 A2 2002-11-20 - Minimum order UHF TV coupled-cavities broadcasting filter

Title (en)

Minimum order UHF TV coupled-cavities broadcasting filter

Title (de)

Mimimumordnungsfilter mit gekoppelten Topfkreisen für UHF-Fernsehübertragung

Title (fr)

Filtre ordre minimal avec cavités couplées pour canaux de télévision UHF

Publication

EP 1258941 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02425250 A

Priority

IT SO20010002 A

Abstract (en)

UHF TV broadcasting band pass filter featuring four cylindrical square-cavity resonators with generalized couplings and Cascade Quadruplet configuration with a sign reversal between the middle resonators, the filter end sections being coupled to the input and output connectors by means of adjustable rotating probes. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 1/205

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/205 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/2053 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258941 A2 20021120; EP 1258941 A3 20030827; IT SO20010002 A1 20021118

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040716

2004-05-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-04-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COM-TECH S.R.L.

2004-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040210

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-08-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI