Global Patent Index - EP 1258949 A1

EP 1258949 A1 2002-11-20 - Hooking system and elements for applying this system

Title (en)

Hooking system and elements for applying this system

Title (de)

Anhakungsvorrichtung und Elemente für eine solche Vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Système d'accrochage et éléments mettant en oeuvre ce système

Publication

EP 1258949 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02356076 A

Priority

FR 0106407 A

Abstract (en)

The electrical interconnection system has male elements protruding from a male attachment face (6). There are engagement struts (7) with a free end (8) and a locking web (10). There is a complementary female attachment (14) with sockets (15) receiving the strut section and an engagement cavity (17) attaching the units. A locking step (18) cooperates with the locking web to prevent sliding.

Abstract (fr)

Ce système d'accrochage comprend : des moyens d'accrochage mâles (3) qui comprennent, en saillie d'une face d'accrochage : au moins un tenon d'axe longitudinal X-X' et pourvu d'une extrémité libre dite d'engagement, une nervure de verrouillage (10) située à distance du tenon, à l'opposé de l'extrémité d'engagement et orientée transversalement à l'axe X-X', des moyens d'accrochage femelles (4), complémentaires des moyens d'accrochage mâles (3), qui comprennent dans une face d'accrochage : au moins une mortaise destinée à recevoir le tenon (7), une cavité dite d'engagement (17) dans laquelle débouche la mortaise au niveau d'une face d'engagement et qui présente des dimensions suffisantes pour permettre l'introduction du tenon dans la mortaise, une butée de verrouillage (18) destinée à coopérer avec la nervure de verrouillage (10) lorsque le tenon est complètement engagé dans la mortaise pour faire obstacle à un glissement relatif du tenon et de la mortaise. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 9/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/24 (2006.01); H01R 9/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/2408 (2013.01); H01R 9/2608 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258949 A1 20021120; FR 2824961 A1 20021122; FR 2824961 B1 20040227; US 2002173203 A1 20021121; US 6626709 B2 20030930

INPADOC legal status


2012-04-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20111101

2010-06-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100525

2007-10-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB FRANCE

2004-03-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB ENTRELEC

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030422

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI