Global Patent Index - EP 1258950 A1

EP 1258950 A1 2002-11-20 - Connecting device - push button

Title (en)

Connecting device - push button

Title (de)

Anschlussvorrichtung - Druckknopf

Title (fr)

Dispositif de raccordement - poussoir

Publication

EP 1258950 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02356077 A

Priority

FR 0106406 A

Abstract (en)

The electrical cable connection element has an isolating unit (2) with an opening (3) for the electric cable. A spring (7) connection element (5) is placed in the isolating unit gripping the conductor centre. A push section (5) associated with the connection element connects the cable. The push section has a test passage (23) allowing measurement of the connection element contact (24).

Abstract (fr)

Ce dispositif de raccordement comprend : un boîtier isolant (2) comprenant au moins une ouverture (3) pour l'introduction du câble électrique (9), un élément de connexion (5) qui est disposé dans le boîtier isolant (2) et qui comprend au moins un ressort de connexion (7) destiné à pincer l'âme conductrice (8) du câble (9) ou le connecteur enfichable, et un poussoir (15) associé à l'élément de connexion (5) pour comprimer le ressort (7) et permettre la mise en place du câble électrique ou du connecteur enfichable. Le poussoir possède un passage (23) dit de test, permettant d'amener un dispositif de mesure au contact d'une partie (24) de l'élément de connexion. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 9/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/26 (2006.01); H01R 4/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/2666 (2013.01); H01R 4/4836 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1258950 A1 20021120; FR 2824960 A1 20021122; FR 2824960 B1 20030815; US 2002187670 A1 20021212; US 6682364 B2 20040127

INPADOC legal status


2011-06-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20101209

2009-11-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091022

2007-10-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB FRANCE

2004-03-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB ENTRELEC

2003-08-20 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-08-06 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030520

- Countries: AL

2003-08-06 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030520

- Countries: LT

2003-08-06 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030520

- Countries: LV

2003-08-06 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030520

- Countries: MK

2003-08-06 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030520

- Countries: RO

2003-08-06 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030520

- Countries: SI

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030422

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI