Global Patent Index - EP 1259099 A2

EP 1259099 A2 2002-11-20 - Glow starter

Title (en)

Glow starter

Title (de)

Glimmzünder

Title (fr)

Amorçeur du type à lueur

Publication

EP 1259099 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02005138 A

Priority

DE 10125212 A

Abstract (en)

Daylight and artificial light charge up a reserve of luminous matter (5) that emits light through which material is excited in order to generate photoelectrons for the starting process for a low-compression discharge lamp. A neon starter (2) has a glass bulb (6) filled with a filling gas. Two electrodes (9,10) fit in the bulb with one or more electrodes made from a thermal bimetal. An Independent claim is also included for a dense fluorescent lamp with a neon starter integrated in the lamp.

Abstract (de)

Offenbart ist ein Verfahren zur Verringerung des Zündverzugs radioaktivitätsfreier Glimmzünder (2), bei dem ein Speicherleuchtstoff (5) verwendet wird, der mittels Tages- oder Kunstlicht aufladbar ist und der bei Dunkelheit Licht emittiert, das seinerseits die Bildung von freien Ladungsträgern innerhalb des Glimmzünders unterstützt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 41/08; H01J 7/30; H01J 17/30; H01J 61/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/54 (2006.01); H01F 38/08 (2006.01); H01J 61/64 (2006.01); H05B 41/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1259099 A2 20021120; EP 1259099 A3 20050511; EP 1259099 B1 20100602; DE 10125212 A1 20021121; DE 50214461 D1 20100715; HU 0201677 A2 20030228; HU 0201677 A3 20031028; HU 0201677 D0 20020729; HU 224295 B1 20050728; JP 2002358932 A 20021213

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50214461

2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140307

2015-02-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140307

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-12-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141128

2014-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140307

2014-10-22 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140319

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-10-17 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OSRAM GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM GMBH, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 50214461

- Effective date: 20130822

2013-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130320

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130320

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130321

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130408

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-03-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OSRAM GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM AG, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 50214461

- Effective date: 20130205

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120328

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-01-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OSRAM GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM GESELLSCHAFT MIT BESCHRAENKTER HAFTUNG, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 50214461

- Effective date: 20111128

2011-12-13 [REG DE R409] INTERNAL RECTIFICATION OF THE LEGAL STATUS COMPLETED

- Document: DE 50214461

2011-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50214461

2011-10-01 [REG DE R409] INTERNAL RECTIFICATION OF THE LEGAL STATUS COMPLETED

- Document: DE 50214461

2011-06-22 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 50214461

- Effective date: 20110302

2011-05-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110303

2010-08-25 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2010-07-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50214461 P 20100715

2010-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2010-06-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2010-03-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: OSRAM GESELLSCHAFT MIT BESCHRAENKTER HAFTUNG

2006-02-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2006-01-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20051107

2005-05-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-05-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2005-05-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 05B 41/08 A

2005-05-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01J 7/30 B

2005-05-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01J 17/30 B

2005-05-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01J 61/54 B

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI