Global Patent Index - EP 1259117 A1

EP 1259117 A1 2002-11-27 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF MILK POWDER

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF MILK POWDER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MILCHPULVER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE LAIT EN POUDRE

Publication

EP 1259117 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01903714 A

Priority

  • EP 01903714 A
  • EP 0101321 W
  • EP 00200616 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1127494A1] A process for the production of a fat-containing milk powder, comprising preparing a liquid milk, feeding the prepared liquid milk into an evaporator having at least one stage to obtain a preconcentrate, homogenising the preconcentrate, further evaporating the preconcentrate in an evaporator having at least one stage to obtain a concentrate having a total solids content of at least 50 %, and then spray drying the concentrate. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A23C 1/04; A23C 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A23C 1/04 (2006.01); A23C 1/05 (2006.01); A23C 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A23C 1/05 (2013.01); A23C 1/04 (2013.01); A23C 1/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0162098A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1127494 A1 20010829; AR 027536 A1 20030402; AT 304293 T 20050915; AU 3170801 A 20010903; AU 782203 B2 20050714; BR 0108506 A 20021224; BR 0108506 B1 20130716; CA 2398291 A1 20010830; CN 100358425 C 20080102; CN 1404362 A 20030319; CO 5180610 A1 20020730; DE 60113385 D1 20051020; DE 60113385 T2 20060614; EP 1259117 A1 20021127; EP 1259117 B1 20050914; ES 2248277 T3 20060316; MX PA02008179 A 20021129; MY 130471 A 20070629; NZ 520347 A 20040326; PL 199649 B1 20081031; PL 357556 A1 20040726; RU 2267274 C2 20060110; TR 200201926 T2 20021121; US 2003113425 A1 20030619; US 6780450 B2 20040824; WO 0162098 A1 20010830; ZA 200207536 B 20030919

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180111

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20180205

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20180116

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20180213

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180213

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180301

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-03-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180214

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-12-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60113385

- Representative's name: ANDRAE WESTENDORP PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050914

2008-07-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050914

2006-11-15 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-10-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060208

2006-08-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060615

2006-05-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2248277 T3

2006-02-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060208

2006-02-08 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060208

2005-12-21 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20050403565

2005-12-14 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051214

2005-12-06 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-10-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60113385 P 20051020

2005-10-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-09-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-09-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-09-14 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050914

2005-09-14 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050914

2005-09-14 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050914

2005-09-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050914

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020923

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR