Global Patent Index - EP 1259156 A1

EP 1259156 A1 2002-11-27 - MEDICAL RISK ASSESSMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD

Title (en)

MEDICAL RISK ASSESSMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD

Title (de)

MEDIZINISCHES RISIKOEVALUIERUNGSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'EVALUATION DES RISQUES MEDICAUX

Publication

EP 1259156 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01912769 A

Priority

  • US 0104938 W
  • US 51861600 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0166007A1] A method of assessing risk for an individual to experience a specific outcome within a disease entity within a specified time frame is provided. Peer-reviewed scientific publications are analyzed to identify pertinent risk factors (212) for developing disease processes and their possible complications. Information that characterizes an individual (218) in relation to the identified risk factors is then received, preferably responsive to question (224) regarding any demographic values of an individual under test and questions regarding medical chracterisitics of the individual under test. An estimate of risk of the individual acquiring the outcome within a specified time frame is performed based on the identified plurality of risk factors (212). Assessment of medical risk and condition may include analyzing peer-reviewed scientific publications to identify populations affected by a medical outcome and for each population respective risk factors that affect risk of acquiring the medical outcome within a specified time-frame, associating an individual with one of the identified population, identifying information that characterizes the individual (218) in relation to the respective risk factors other associated population, and estimating risk of the individual having the medical outcome within the specified the time frame responsive to the identified information. Promotion of business on a site of a computer network is provided by supplying an online questionnaire (224) regarding characteristics of individual (218) under test, receiving information regarding characteristics of the individual under test, and responsive to the received information, providing an assessment of the individual under test having a medical outcome within a specified time frame.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 19/00 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 19/324 (2013.01); G06F 19/00 (2013.01); G06F 19/321 (2013.01); G16H 10/20 (2018.01); G16H 15/00 (2018.01); G16H 50/30 (2018.01); G16H 50/70 (2018.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0166007 A1 20010913; AU 4151501 A 20010917; EP 1259156 A1 20021127; EP 1259156 A4 20050105

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041001

2005-01-05 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041124

2004-12-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 06F 19/00 A

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI