Global Patent Index - EP 1259296 A1

EP 1259296 A1 2002-11-27 - MIXING CHAMBER FOR PRODUCING COMPRESSED AIR FOAM FOR EXTINGUISHING DEVICES

Title (en)

MIXING CHAMBER FOR PRODUCING COMPRESSED AIR FOAM FOR EXTINGUISHING DEVICES

Title (de)

MISCHKAMMER ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON DRUCKLUFTSCHAUM FÜR LÖSCHANLAGEN

Title (fr)

CHAMBRE DE MELANGE DESTINEE A LA PRODUCTION DE MOUSSE A AIR COMPRIME POUR DES INSTALLATIONS D'EXTINCTION

Publication

EP 1259296 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01915056 A

Priority

  • DE 0100752 W
  • DE 10010141 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0164290A1] The invention relates to a mixing chamber for producing compressed air foam for extinguishing devices for fighting fires. Said mixing chamber comprises a compressed air inlet, an extinguishing agent inlet and a compressed air foam outlet. The invention is characterised in that the contour of the mixing chamber tapers towards the compressed air foam outlet. The invention also relates to a fire extinguishing device comprising an extinguishing agent container, a connecting device for connecting to a source of compressed air; and an inventive mixing chamber.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62C 5/02; A62C 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62C 5/02 (2006.01); A62C 31/12 (2006.01); A62C 35/02 (2006.01); A62C 35/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62C 5/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0164290A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0164290 A1 20010907; AT 373507 T 20071015; AU 4228101 A 20010912; CA 2401679 A1 20010907; CA 2401679 C 20090106; CN 1174781 C 20041110; CN 1406145 A 20030326; DE 10010141 C1 20011004; DE 20180049 U1 20021017; DE 50113032 D1 20071031; EP 1259296 A1 20021127; EP 1259296 B1 20070919; ES 2293981 T3 20080401; JP 2003525094 A 20030826; JP 3967132 B2 20070829; US 2003010506 A1 20030116; US 7458427 B2 20081202

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20180220

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180226

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180215

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-03-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-03-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: AVENUE DES MORGINES 12, 1213 PETIT-LANCY (CH)

2018-02-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-06-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50113032

- Representative's name: STAUDT IP LAW, DE

2013-10-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2012-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-11-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110902

2011-11-23 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2010-12-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20100219

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-06-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20100223

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-04-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20100219

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070919

2008-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080228

2008-10-17 [REG FR EERR] CORRECTION AND/OR MODIFICATIONS ON EUROPEAN PATENTS WHICH HAVE EFFECT OR NO EFFECT IN FRANCE

- Free text: CORRECTION DE BOPI 08/21 - BREVETS EUROPEENS DONT LA TRADUCTION N A PAS ETE REMISE A L INPI. IL Y A LIEU DE SUPPRIMER : LA MENTION DE LA NON-REMISE. LA REMISE DE LA TRADUCTION EST PUBLIEE DANS LE PRESENT BOPI.

2008-10-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080523

2008-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080620

2008-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070919

2008-06-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071219

2008-05-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080219

2008-05-23 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2008-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2293981 T3

2008-02-05 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20070403763

2008-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070919

2008-01-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20071210

2007-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KATZAROV S.A.

2007-11-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2007-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50113032 P 20071031

2007-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2007-09-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020726

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI