Global Patent Index - EP 1259307 A1

EP 1259307 A1 2002-11-27 - METHOD FOR REMOVAL OF NOX AND N2O

Title (en)

METHOD FOR REMOVAL OF NOX AND N2O

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR BESEITIGUNG VON NOX UND N20

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'ELIMINATION DE NOX ET DE N2O

Publication

EP 1259307 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01905656 A

Priority

  • DE 10001539 A
  • EP 0100156 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0151181A1] A device and method for the reduction of NOx and N2O content in process gases and exhaust gases are disclosed. The device comprises at least one catalyst bed, containing a catalyst, with essentially one, or several, iron-loaded zeolites and two reaction zones, whereby the first zone (Reaction zone I) serves for the decomposition of N2O and in the second zone (Reaction zone II) NOx is reduced. A device for the introduction of NH3 gas is situated between the first and second zones.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01D 53/86; B01J 29/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 53/86 (2006.01); B01J 29/06 (2006.01); B01J 29/072 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01J 29/072 (2013.01); B01D 53/8628 (2013.01); B01D 53/8631 (2013.01); B01D 2255/20738 (2013.01); B01D 2255/50 (2013.01); B01D 2255/504 (2013.01); B01D 2257/402 (2013.01); B01D 2257/404 (2013.01); Y02C 20/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0151181A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0151181 A1 20010719; AU 3368801 A 20010724; AU 778960 B2 20041223; CA 2397250 A1 20010719; CA 2397250 C 20090915; CN 1214850 C 20050817; CN 1395501 A 20030205; CZ 20022433 A3 20030618; CZ 304536 B6 20140625; DE 10001539 A1 20010802; DE 10001539 B4 20060119; EP 1259307 A1 20021127; HU 0204088 A2 20030428; HU 0204088 A3 20040830; HU 0600086 V0 20060529; IL 150700 A 20090211; IN 1066CH2002 A 20071005; IN 221362 B 20080912; KR 100785645 B1 20071214; KR 20020081255 A 20021026; MX 238489 B 20060707; MX PA02006927 A 20021129; NO 20023342 A 20020905; NO 20023342 D0 20020711; NO 335080 B1 20140908; PL 213696 B1 20130430; PL 356347 A1 20040628; RU 2002121783 A 20040327; RU 2264845 C2 20051127; US 2003143141 A1 20030731; ZA 200205511 B 20031007

INPADOC legal status


2014-10-01 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20140717

2014-07-17 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2011-12-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP UHDE GMBH

2003-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030522

2002-12-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: UHDE GMBH

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020814

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI